EP1440916 - Closing device for Manhole as well as tank with such manhole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maisonneuve Rue de la Gare 50510 Cerences / FR | [2004/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maisonneuve, Luc Rue de la Gare 50510 Cerences / FR | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Roussel, Eric Marcel Henri Cabinet Regimbeau Espace Performance Bâtiment K 35769 Saint-Grégoire / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Roussel, Eric Marcel Henri Cabinet Régimbeau, Espace Performance, Bâtiment K 35769 Saint-Grégoire / FR | ||
Former [2004/31] | Roussel, Eric Marcel Henri Cabinet Régimbeau, Espace Performance, Bâtiment K 35760 Saint-Grégoire / FR | Application number, filing date | 04364002.8 | 21.01.2004 | [2004/31] | Priority number, date | FR20030000770 | 24.01.2003 Original published format: FR 0300770 | [2004/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1440916 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1440916 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D90/10, B65D90/34, B60P3/22 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
B65D90/10 (EP);
B65D90/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/31] | Title | German: | Schliessvorrichtung eines Mannlochs sowie Tank mit einem solchen Mannloch | [2004/31] | English: | Closing device for Manhole as well as tank with such manhole | [2004/31] | French: | Dispositif de fermeture d'un trou d'homme de citerne et citerne munie de celui-ci | [2004/31] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 10.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.12.2008 | CY | 10.12.2008 | CZ | 10.12.2008 | DK | 10.12.2008 | EE | 10.12.2008 | FI | 10.12.2008 | IE | 10.12.2008 | IT | 10.12.2008 | NL | 10.12.2008 | RO | 10.12.2008 | SI | 10.12.2008 | SK | 10.12.2008 | TR | 10.12.2008 | LU | 21.01.2009 | BE | 31.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | FR | 10.02.2009 | BG | 10.03.2009 | GB | 10.03.2009 | SE | 10.03.2009 | GR | 11.03.2009 | ES | 21.03.2009 | PT | 11.05.2009 | HU | 11.06.2009 | DE | 01.08.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
LU | 21.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 10.02.2009 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GB | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
HU | 11.06.2009 | ||
DE | 01.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
LU | 21.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 10.02.2009 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GB | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 10.02.2009 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GB | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 10.02.2009 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GB | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 10.02.2009 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GB | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 10.02.2009 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | EE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | FI | 10.12.2008 | |
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 10.12.2008 | |
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3733750 (HEGE S) [A] 1,15 * abstract *; | [A]FR2446200 (MAGYAR SA G) [A] 1,15 * page 1, line 5 - line 15; figure - *; | [A]US4327522 (MEADOWS WILLIAM W) [A] 1-3,14-16 * column 1, line 29 - line 42; figures 3-5 *; | [A]DE8712199U (DÜPERTHAL GMBH) [A] 1,15,16* page 4, line 1 - line 8; figure - *; | [A]FR2656286 (ETS MAGYAR [FR]) [A] 1,15 * abstract *; | [A]FR2665146 (ETS MAGYAR [FR]) [A] 1,15,16 * abstract * |