EP1635444 - Shutdown circuit for a charge pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dialog Semiconductor GmbH Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim/Teck-Nabern / DE | [2006/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Somerville, Alan 39 Eastern Ave. Chippenham, Wilts / GB | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Schuffenecker, Thierry 120 Chemin de la Maure 06800 Cagnes-sur-Mer / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Schuffenecker, Thierry 120 Chemin de la Maure 06800 Cagnes sur Mer / FR | Application number, filing date | 04368062.8 | 14.09.2004 | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1635444 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1635444 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/07, H02M1/36 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
H02M3/073 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/11] | H02M3/07 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Title | German: | Abschaltvorrichtung für Ladungspumpeschaltung | [2006/11] | English: | Shutdown circuit for a charge pump | [2006/11] | French: | Circuit d'arrêt pour une pompe de charge | [2008/32] |
Former [2006/11] | Ciruit d'arrêt pour une pompe de charge | Examination procedure | 14.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 21.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.01.2009 | BE | 07.01.2009 | CY | 07.01.2009 | CZ | 07.01.2009 | DK | 07.01.2009 | EE | 07.01.2009 | FI | 07.01.2009 | IT | 07.01.2009 | NL | 07.01.2009 | PL | 07.01.2009 | RO | 07.01.2009 | SI | 07.01.2009 | SK | 07.01.2009 | TR | 07.01.2009 | BG | 07.04.2009 | SE | 07.04.2009 | GR | 08.04.2009 | ES | 18.04.2009 | PT | 08.06.2009 | HU | 08.07.2009 | IE | 14.09.2009 | LU | 14.09.2009 | CH | 30.09.2009 | LI | 30.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IT | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
HU | 08.07.2009 | ||
IE | 14.09.2009 | ||
LU | 14.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IT | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
IE | 14.09.2009 | ||
LU | 14.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IT | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
IE | 14.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
IE | 14.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
IE | 14.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | NL | 07.01.2009 | |
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | NL | 07.01.2009 | |
SI | 07.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6255896 (LI BO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 46; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2001015672 (REY OLIVIER [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0038] , [0039]; figure 6 *; | [A]EP1278202 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0026] - [0046]; figures 1a,2a *; | [A]DE10202478 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [A] 1-15* abstract * |