EP1614909 - Fastening method for objects and lights with plasticised metallic accessories and bolts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palaiohorinos, Ioannis Odos A7 Ktirio 24 Ot 18 Vipeth TK 570 22 Thessaloniki / GR | [2006/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/02] | Application number, filing date | 04386024.6 | 21.09.2004 | [2006/02] | Priority number, date | GR20040100285 | 07.07.2004 Original published format: GR 2004100285 | [2006/02] | Filing language | EL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1614909 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1614909 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16B2/06, F21V21/116 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
F21V21/116 (EP);
F21V21/02 (EP);
F16B2/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] |
Former [2007/29] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2006/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Befestigung von Gegenständen und Leuchten mit plastifizierten metallischen Zubehörteilen und Bolzen | [2006/02] | English: | Fastening method for objects and lights with plasticised metallic accessories and bolts | [2006/02] | French: | Méthode de fixation d'objets et luminaires avec accessoires et boulons métalliques plastifiés | [2006/02] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2007 | Observations by third parties | 17.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/42] | 01.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.06.2007 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | 05.06.2007 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.06.2007 | M01   Fee paid on   20.06.2007 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.11.2006 | 30.09.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   16.03.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3243152 (HARLING DONALD W) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 48 - line 54 * * column 2, line 3 - line 39 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US3927315 (WERRY ARTHUR W) [A] 1 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 6 ** figures 1,4 *; | [Y]US5290131 (HENRIKSEN ARNE [US]) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 8 - line 19 *; | [A]GB2329824 (SHIPLEY STEPHEN PHILIP [GB]) [A] 1 * page 3 - page 4 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6135624 (MASTERS ANDREW EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 7 - line 12 * * figures 1,2,14,16 *; | [Y]US2004061032 (BRADFORD REED A [US], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * figures 1,2 *; | [PY]EP1457954 (PALAIOHORINOS IOANNIS [GR]) [PY] 1 * figures 1-6 * | Examination | GB2334431 | FR2781258 | other | GB2334431 | FR2781258 | - "Nouvelle fixation universelle blachere sur candelabre en option ref: fix01", CATALOGUE BLACHERE ILLUMINATION, (1998), page 72, XP003008168 |