EP1478215 - Package modification for channel-routed circuit boards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Difilippo, Luigi 23 Hemlo Crest Kanata, ON K2T 1C7 / CA | 02 /
Wyrzykowska, Aneta 52 Shearer Crest Kanata, ON K2L 3N2 / CA | 03 /
Kwong, Herman 15 Hewitt Way Kanata, ON K2L 3S2 / CA | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Boyce, Conor, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Boyce, Conor, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2004/47] | Boyce, Conor, et al F.R. Kelly & Co, 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge, Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 04394023.8 | 07.05.2004 | [2004/47] | Priority number, date | US20030437006 | 14.05.2003 Original published format: US 437006 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1478215 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1478215 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/30, H05K3/46 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
H05K1/112 (EP,US);
H05K3/303 (EP,US);
H01L2224/14 (EP,US);
H01L2224/17 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09472 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09518 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09536 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10318 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10424 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10659 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10704 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10734 (EP,US);
H05K3/4623 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4913 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49135 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49139 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/0401 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/41] |
Former [2004/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Packungsmodifizierung für Kanalführungs-Leiterplatten | [2004/47] | English: | Package modification for channel-routed circuit boards | [2004/47] | French: | Modification d'empaquetages pour des panneaux de circuit à des canaux d'acheminement | [2004/47] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 02.04.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH04184990 ; | [A]JPH05343592 ; | [A]JP2000004086 ; | [A]US4530002 (KANAI YASUNORI [JP]) [A] 1-4,6-11 * figures 9,10 *; | [A]US5386626 (CHENG HING-LIANG [TW]) [A] 5* figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1049162 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,6,7,10,11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6388890 (KWONG HERMAN [CA], et al) [Y] 1-4,6-11 * figure -; claim - * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921015), vol. 016, no. 499, Database accession no. (E - 1280), & JP04184990 A 19920701 (FUJITSU LTD) [Y] 1-4,6-11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940323), vol. 018, no. 171, Database accession no. (E - 1529), & JP05343592 A 19931224 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-4,6-11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000004086 A 20000107 (TOSHIBA CORP; TOSHIBA COMPUT ENG CORP) [A] 1-4,6-11 * abstract * |