EP1541053 - Trekking or nordic walking stick with shock-absorber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lekisport AG Lindenstrasse 8 6340 Baar / CH | [2005/49] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Lekisport AG Zuger Strasse 74 6340 Baar / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lenhart, Klaus Mittlerer Weg 23 73275 Ohmden / DE | [2005/43] |
Former [2005/24] | 01 /
Lenhart, Klaus Mittlerer Weg 23 73275 Ohmden / CH | Representative(s) | Groner, Manfred Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Groner, Manfred Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2006/39] | Groner, Manfred Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Gotthardstrasse 53 8023 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2005/24] | Fuhlendorf, Jörn, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04400064.4 | 25.11.2004 | [2005/24] | Priority number, date | DE2003218682U | 27.11.2003 Original published format: DE 20318682 U | [2005/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1541053 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A45B9/04 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
A45B9/04 (EP);
A61H3/0277 (EP);
A45B2200/055 (EP);
A61H2003/0283 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [2006/10] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Trekking- oder Nordic Walking-Stock mit Gummipuffer | [2005/24] | English: | Trekking or nordic walking stick with shock-absorber | [2005/24] | French: | Bâton de trekking ou de marche nordique avec un amortisseur | [2005/24] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 16.12.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.04.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/51] | 01.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.01.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE7246457U (STUECKE E) [X] 1-3,10,11 * page 3, line 10 - page 5, line 3 *; | [X]DE2507284 (STUECKE ERICH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7,10-12 * page 2, line 12 - page 5, line 7 *; | [X]DE3604414 (SCHILLING OSTERMEYER MASCHINEN [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,8,11 * column 11, line 2 - column 19, line 21 *; | [A]US5301704 (BROWN E EVANGELINE [US]); | [X]US5826606 (DAVENPORT RONALD K [US]) [X] 1-5,10,11 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 34 * * column 1, lines 54-65 *; | [A]EP0978298 (EXEL OY [FI]); | [X]WO0010502 (MCGRATH THOMAS FRANCIS [GB]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,11 * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 8 * |