EP1569254 - Switch with earthing and/or disconnecting function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pavlovic, Bojan Wartauweg 20 8049 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Bleiker, Daniel Binzmühlestrasse 260 8046 Zürich / CH | 03 /
Sologuren-Sanchez, Diego Lindenhof 14 5430 Wettingen / CH | 04 /
Holaus, Walter Okenstrasse 7 8037 Zürich / CH | 05 /
Wieser, Martin Wellhauserweg 41 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [2005/35] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG, Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 04405113.4 | 27.02.2004 | [2005/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1569254 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01H31/00, H02B13/035 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
H01H31/003 (EP,US);
H01H33/42 (EP,KR,US);
H01H33/50 (KR);
H01H33/66 (KR);
H01H33/664 (KR);
H01H11/0031 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | [2006/20] |
Former [2005/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaltgerät mit Trenn-und/oder Erdungsfunktion | [2005/35] | English: | Switch with earthing and/or disconnecting function | [2005/35] | French: | Interrupteur de mise à la terre et/ou sectionneur | [2005/35] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/48] | 29.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.04.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.04.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000134733 ; | [A]US6559403 (GUTALJ VLADIMIR [CH]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP1361633 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, & JP2000134733 A 20000512 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |