EP1577904 - High voltage bushing with element for electric-field control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. Affolternstrasse 52 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states ABB RESEARCH LTD. Affolternstrasse 52 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Donzel, Lise Landstrasse 82 5430 Wettingen / CH | 02 /
Greuter, Felix Im Bettliacher 8 5406 Rütihof / CH | 03 /
Gramespacher, Hansjoerg Loorenstrasse 27 5443 Niederrohrdorf / CH | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP) Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2005/38] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG, Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 04405151.4 | 15.03.2004 | [2005/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1577904 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1577904 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01B17/28 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
H01B17/28 (EP,US);
H01B17/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Title | German: | Hochspannungsdurchführung mit Feldsteuermaterial | [2005/38] | English: | High voltage bushing with element for electric-field control | [2005/38] | French: | Traversée haute tension avec élément pour les contrôle du champ électrique | [2005/38] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 16.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2006 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2004 | CY | 22.02.2012 | CZ | 22.02.2012 | DK | 22.02.2012 | EE | 22.02.2012 | FI | 22.02.2012 | IE | 22.02.2012 | NL | 22.02.2012 | PL | 22.02.2012 | RO | 22.02.2012 | SI | 22.02.2012 | SK | 22.02.2012 | TR | 22.02.2012 | AT | 15.03.2012 | LU | 15.03.2012 | BE | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | BG | 22.05.2012 | GB | 22.05.2012 | GR | 23.05.2012 | ES | 02.06.2012 | PT | 22.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
AT | 15.03.2012 | ||
LU | 15.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GB | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
AT | 15.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GB | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
AT | 15.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GB | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GB | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GB | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GB | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 22.02.2012 | |
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | NL | 22.02.2012 | |
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | NL | 22.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB842039 (ASEA AB) [X] 1,2,11 * page 2, line 47 - line 106; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US3318995 (BUCKLEY RICHARD D, et al) [X] 1,3-5,10-13 * column 1, line 15 - line 39 * * column 3, line 38 - line 40 * * column 4, line 7 - line 43; figure 1 * * column 8, line 45 - line 50; figure 3 * [Y] 6-10; | [X]US4272642 (CLASSON AKE) [X] 1,3,7 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 15; figures 1,2 *; | [YD]WO9933065 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE], et al) [YD] 6,10 * page 4, paragraph V * * page 7, line 5 - line 10 *; | [Y]US6534721 (HOEFNER ROLAND [DE]) [Y] 7-9 * column 3, line 48 - line 53 ** column 6, line 32 - line 55; figure 3 * | by applicant | US3318995 | DE19844409 | EP1042756 | - L. B. WAGENAAR, Electrical Bushings, pages 3 - 171,3-18 |