Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1586713 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2009 | B1 | EP1586713 | 19.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04405231 | 15.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE451506T | 15.12.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP04405231 | 15.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502004010488D1 | 21.01.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP04405231 | 15.04.2004 |