EP1586713 - Device and method for automatic iniciation of flushing of a flushing device using a capacitive sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geberit International AG Schachenstrasse 77 8645 Jona / CH | [2009/46] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states GEBERIT TECHNIK AG Schachenstrasse 77 8645 Jona / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elsener, René Haberweidstrasse 33 8610 Uster / CH | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 04405231.4 | 15.04.2004 | [2005/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1586713 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1586713 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E03D5/10, G01F23/26 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
G01F23/265 (EP);
E03D5/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur selbstständigen Spülauslösung einer Spülvorrichtung mittels eines kapazitiven Sensors | [2005/42] | English: | Device and method for automatic iniciation of flushing of a flushing device using a capacitive sensor | [2005/42] | French: | Dispositif et méthode d'initiation automatique de rincage d'un dispositif de chasse d'eau utilisant un capteur capacitif | [2005/42] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 06.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.02.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 23.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 02.03.2007 | Appeal received No. T0548/07 | 02.03.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.02.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.12.2009 | CZ | 09.12.2009 | DK | 09.12.2009 | EE | 09.12.2009 | FI | 09.12.2009 | IE | 09.12.2009 | IT | 09.12.2009 | NL | 09.12.2009 | PL | 09.12.2009 | RO | 09.12.2009 | SE | 09.12.2009 | SI | 09.12.2009 | SK | 09.12.2009 | TR | 09.12.2009 | BG | 09.03.2010 | GR | 10.03.2010 | ES | 20.03.2010 | PT | 09.04.2010 | GB | 15.04.2010 | LU | 15.04.2010 | BE | 30.04.2010 | FR | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | HU | 10.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
GB | 15.04.2010 | ||
LU | 15.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 10.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
GB | 15.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 10.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
GB | 15.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
GB | 15.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CY | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CY | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | CZ | 09.12.2009 | |
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CZ | 09.12.2009 | |
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | EE | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | FI | 09.12.2009 | |
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 09.12.2009 | |
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 09.12.2009 | |
SE | 09.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US669037 (STEVENS JOHN WALTER [US]) [Y] 1-6 * figures 1,2 *; | [DA]DE3228061 (BIERI PUMPENBAU AG [CH]) [DA] 1,6 * figure 1 *; | [DA]DE10006670 (FRIATEC AG [DE]) [DA] 1,6 * column 3, line 20 - line 23 ** figure 1 *; | [Y]WO0250498 (ABERTAX INTERNAT RES AND DEV M [MT], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 11, lines 2-4 * * figure 9 *; | [X]DE10111210 (MEPA DIPL ING ROBERT KUEHNEL G [AT]) [X] 1,6 * column 3, line 40 - line 66 * * figures 1-3 * |