EP1600132 - Disposable absorbent article with adjustable and prefastening tape [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyga SA Fabriksstrasse 1 2543 Lengnau / CH | [2005/48] | Application number, filing date | 04405333.8 | 28.05.2004 | [2005/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1600132 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/56, A61F13/15 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
A61F13/493 (EP);
A61F13/15756 (EP);
A61F13/496 (EP);
A61F13/4963 (EP);
A61F13/5655 (EP);
A61F2013/49087 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wegwerfwindel mit einstellbarem und vorbefestigendem Verschluss | [2005/48] | English: | Disposable absorbent article with adjustable and prefastening tape | [2005/48] | French: | Couches-culottes à jeter avec fermeture ajustable et préfixante | [2005/48] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/15] | 08.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [2006/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4209016 (SCHAAR CHARLES H [US]) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US5108384 (GOULAIT DAVID J K [US]) [X] 14,15,17-20 * figure -; claim - *; | [DX]US5370634 (ANDO KENJI [JP], et al) [DX] 1-3,5,9-15,18-20 * column 6, lines 45-64; figures 4,5; claim - *; | [DX]US5624428 (SAUER BARBARA O [US]) [DX] 1,2,6,7,10-14,17-20 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0927550 (PROTECO [FR]) [X] 14,15,17-20 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO0236060 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [DX]US6454752 (HUANG YUNG HSIANG [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,6-14,17-22 * column 6, lines 26-64 * * column 13, line 10 - column 16, line 20; figures 3a-c; claim - *; | [DX]US2002165517 (DATTA PAUL JOSEPH [US], et al) [DX] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2002173768 (ELSBERG LAURA LINDA [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US6524293 (ELSBERG LAURA LINDA [US], et al) [X] 1* figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2003088223 (VOGT ROBERT EUGENE [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2003100880 (MAGEE LUKE ROBINSON [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-15,17-22 * paragraphs [0033] , [0035] , [0044] - [0047] - [0051] , [0052] , [0063]; claim - *; | [DX]US2003216706 (OLSSON KEN [SE], et al) [DX] 1-3,5-15,17-22 * paragraphs [0045] - [0050] - [0052] , [0053] , [0069] , [0071] , [0078] - [0085] - [0087] , [0094]; figure -; claim - * |