EP1612169 - Installation for feeding paper reels to a reel stand and method for its operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/01] | System for supplying paper rolls to a roll stand and method of operating the same | ||
[2007/17] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states vR Systems AG Route de Moutier 109 2800 Delémont / CH | [2008/10] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states Metso Paper AG 109, Route de Moutier 2800 Delémont / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frey, Hans Spitalstrasse 28a 4226 Breitenbach / CH | 02 /
Frund, Martial Rue Es Cres 23 2830 Courrendlin / CH | 03 /
Brändli, Walter Kundmatt 20 4242 Laufen / CH | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Wolfgang Heribert Zimmerli, Wagner & Partner AG Apollostrasse 2 Postfach 1021 8032 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Wagner, Wolfgang Heribert Zimmerli, Wagner & Partner AG Apollostrasse 2, Postfach 1021 8032 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2006/01] | Wagner, Wolfgang Heribert Zimmerli, Wagner & Partner AG Löwenstrasse 19 8021 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 04405410.4 | 02.07.2004 | [2006/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1612169 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1612169 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1612169 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/12 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
B65H19/126 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41702 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4186 (EP,US);
B65H2405/422 (EP,US);
B65H2405/4223 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1849 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Title | German: | Anlage zur Zuführung von Papierrollen zu einem Rollenständer und Verfahren zu ihrem Betrieb | [2006/01] | English: | Installation for feeding paper reels to a reel stand and method for its operation | [2007/17] | French: | Installation d'alimentation d'un porte-bobine en bobines de papier et procédé pour son fonctionnement | [2007/17] |
Former [2006/01] | System for supplying paper rolls to a roll stand and method of operating the same | ||
Former [2006/01] | Système d'alimentation en rouleaux de papier d'un porte-bobine et procédé de fonctionnement associé | Examination procedure | 27.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 09.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.11.2008
20.11.2008
ADMISSIBLE KBA König & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft - Lizenzen - Patente Friedrich-Koenig-Str. 4 97080 Würzburg / DE Opponent's representative Stiel, Jürgen Koenig & Bauer AG Lizenzen - Patente Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | 02
13.11.2008
ADMISSIBLE manroland AG Stadtbachstrasse 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.11.2008
20.11.2008
ADMISSIBLE KBA König & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft - Lizenzen - Patente Friedrich-Koenig-Str. 4 97080 Würzburg / DE Opponent's representative Stiel, Jürgen Koenig & Bauer AG, Lizenzen - Patente, Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | ||
02
13.11.2008
ADMISSIBLE manroland AG Stadtbachstrasse 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | 22.12.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 05.11.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.02.2008 | DK | 13.02.2008 | EE | 13.02.2008 | FI | 13.02.2008 | IE | 13.02.2008 | RO | 13.02.2008 | SI | 13.02.2008 | SK | 13.02.2008 | TR | 13.02.2008 | BG | 13.05.2008 | SE | 13.05.2008 | GR | 14.05.2008 | AT | 02.07.2008 | LU | 02.07.2008 | PT | 14.07.2008 | CH | 31.07.2008 | LI | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | HU | 14.08.2008 | CZ | 02.07.2009 | IT | 02.07.2009 | ES | 03.07.2009 | [2020/33] |
Former [2011/14] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
TR | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
GR | 14.05.2008 | ||
AT | 02.07.2008 | ||
LU | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2009 | ||
IT | 02.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
TR | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
GR | 14.05.2008 | ||
AT | 02.07.2008 | ||
LU | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/38] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
TR | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
AT | 02.07.2008 | ||
LU | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
AT | 02.07.2008 | ||
LU | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
AT | 02.07.2008 | ||
LU | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
AT | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
AT | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | DK | 13.02.2008 | |
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 13.02.2008 | |
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 13.02.2008 | |
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | DK | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | DK | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 13.02.2008 | |
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 13.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2181117 (WIFAG MASCHF) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5076751 (KAFKA ALFRED J [US]) [A] 1,7* column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 68; figures 1,4 *; | [A]US5085377 (ROHRER JEAN [CH], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 5, line 30 - column 7, line 51; figures 2,3,5-7 *; | [A]US6155516 (LEHRIEDER ERWIN PAUL JOSEF [DE], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 24; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO03080484 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,7 * page 6, line 11 - page 10, line 2; figures 1,2 * |