EP1498370 - Device for orienting articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/18] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Peter Schwärziweg 9 8222 Beringen / CH | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Clerc, Natalia, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Clerc, Natalia, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 04405434.4 | 08.07.2004 | [2005/03] | Priority number, date | CH20030001251 | 17.07.2003 Original published format: CH 12512003 | [2005/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1498370 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1498370 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/244, B65G13/02 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
B65G13/02 (EP,US);
B65G47/2445 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Drehen eines Gegenstandes | [2005/03] | English: | Device for orienting articles | [2005/03] | French: | Dispositif pour orienter des articles | [2005/03] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/16] | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.05.2006 | CZ | 03.05.2006 | EE | 03.05.2006 | FI | 03.05.2006 | IE | 03.05.2006 | PL | 03.05.2006 | RO | 03.05.2006 | SI | 03.05.2006 | SK | 03.05.2006 | TR | 03.05.2006 | LU | 08.07.2006 | BE | 31.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | BG | 03.08.2006 | DK | 03.08.2006 | GR | 04.08.2006 | PT | 03.10.2006 | HU | 04.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
EE | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
PL | 03.05.2006 | ||
RO | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
TR | 03.05.2006 | ||
LU | 08.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 03.08.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
HU | 04.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
EE | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
PL | 03.05.2006 | ||
RO | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 03.08.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
HU | 04.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
EE | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
PL | 03.05.2006 | ||
RO | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 03.08.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
EE | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
PL | 03.05.2006 | ||
RO | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
PL | 03.05.2006 | ||
RO | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
PL | 03.05.2006 | ||
RO | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
PL | 03.05.2006 | ||
RO | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
PL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
PL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
PL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 03.05.2006 | |
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | SI | 03.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59138519 ; | [A]JP9286515 ; | [A]US6126383 (FRANKLIN JOSEPH F [US], et al) [A] 1,4,12 * figure 3 *; | [PA]US2003234155 (KANAMORI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [PA] 1,2,4-6 * paragraph [0091]; figure 13 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841207), vol. 0082, no. 67, Database accession no. (M - 343), & JP59138519 A 19840809 (SHIGUNOODO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, & JP9286515 A 19971104 (ISHII IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |