EP1510306 - Presser assembly for separating blanks cut in a sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOBST S.A. Case Postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | [2005/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steiner, Jean-Pierre Chemin du Couchant 16 1023 Crissier / CH | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Poirier, Jean-Michel Serge BOBST S.A. Case postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Poirier, Jean-Michel Serge BOBST S.A. Case postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | ||
Former [2005/09] | Savoye, Jean-Paul, et al Moinas & Savoye S.A., 42, rue Plantamour 1201 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 04405477.3 | 26.07.2004 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | EP20030405629 | 01.09.2003 Original published format: EP 03405629 | [2005/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510306 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1510306 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/18 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
B26D7/1818 (EP);
B26D7/025 (EP);
B26D7/2614 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Title | German: | Klemmeinrichtung zum Trennen von aus einem blattförmigen Material geschnittenen Zuschnitten | [2005/09] | English: | Presser assembly for separating blanks cut in a sheet | [2005/09] | French: | Ensemble presseur pour la séparation de poses découpées dans une feuille | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 20.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2006 | CY | 26.07.2006 | CZ | 26.07.2006 | EE | 26.07.2006 | FI | 26.07.2006 | IE | 26.07.2006 | IT | 26.07.2006 | LU | 26.07.2006 | NL | 26.07.2006 | PL | 26.07.2006 | RO | 26.07.2006 | SI | 26.07.2006 | SK | 26.07.2006 | TR | 26.07.2006 | BE | 31.07.2006 | FR | 31.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | BG | 26.10.2006 | DK | 26.10.2006 | SE | 26.10.2006 | GR | 27.10.2006 | ES | 06.11.2006 | PT | 26.12.2006 | HU | 27.01.2007 | DE | 01.02.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LU | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
TR | 26.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
FR | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
HU | 27.01.2007 | ||
DE | 01.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
FR | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
HU | 27.01.2007 | ||
DE | 01.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
FR | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
DE | 01.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
FR | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
DE | 01.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
DE | 01.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
DE | 01.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/31] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 26.07.2006 | |
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | FI | 26.07.2006 | |
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 26.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2825631 (KHU PETER); | [A]EP0384675 (NIPPON DIE STEEL KK [JP], et al); | [DA]US5529565 (OETLINGER FRANK E [US]); | [A]US5766123 (OETLINGER FRANK E [US]); | [DA]US2003032539 (TARKA MICHAEL P [US]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |