EP1630840 - Heavy-duty circuit-breaker with reversal of the movement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Opposition rejected | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hunger, Olaf Herrenacker 19 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | 02 /
Claessens, Max Riedwiesstrasse 31 5412 Gebenstorf / CH | 03 /
Holstein, Martin Birchstrasse 18 5406 Baden-Rütihof / CH | 04 /
Abrahamson, Johan Lindenstrasse 13 5430 Wettingen / CH | 05 /
Kriegel, Martin Mooshalde 10 5424 Unterehrendingen / CH | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG, Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 04405525.9 | 23.08.2004 | [2006/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1630840 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1630840 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/90 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
H01H33/901 (EP,US);
H01H2033/028 (EP,US);
H01H3/42 (EP);
H01H33/7023 (EP,US);
H01H33/765 (EP,US);
H01H33/904 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Title | German: | Hochleistungsschalter mit Bewegungsumkehr | [2006/09] | English: | Heavy-duty circuit-breaker with reversal of the movement | [2006/09] | French: | Disjoncteur-limiteur avec inversion du mouvement | [2006/09] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 20.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.08.2007
14.09.2007
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.08.2007
14.09.2007
ADMISSIBLE SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.08.2007
Siemens AG Abteilung: CT IP PTD Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | 29.10.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.06.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.09.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.10.2009 | 14.10.2009 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 19.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.10.2009 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.12.2006 | CZ | 20.12.2006 | DK | 20.12.2006 | EE | 20.12.2006 | FI | 20.12.2006 | IE | 20.12.2006 | NL | 20.12.2006 | PL | 20.12.2006 | RO | 20.12.2006 | SI | 20.12.2006 | SK | 20.12.2006 | TR | 20.12.2006 | BG | 20.03.2007 | GR | 21.03.2007 | ES | 31.03.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | HU | 21.06.2007 | AT | 23.08.2007 | LU | 23.08.2007 | BE | 31.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | CY | 20.12.2006 | |
CZ | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
EE | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
PL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
AT | 23.08.2007 | ||
LU | 23.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 20.12.2006 | |
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
EE | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
PL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
AT | 23.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 20.12.2006 | |
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
PL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
AT | 23.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/40] | CZ | 20.12.2006 | |
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
PL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 20.12.2006 | |
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
PL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | CZ | 20.12.2006 | |
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
PL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
SI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SK | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 20.12.2006 | |
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
PL | 20.12.2006 | ||
RO | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 20.12.2006 | |
PL | 20.12.2006 | ||
BG | 20.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0052721 (ALSTOM [FR], et al) [A] 1,18 * page 10, line 6 - line 22; figures 2-7 *; | [A]DE10003357 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,18* abstract * |