EP1518803 - Sheet positioning device in a feeding station of a treatment machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOBST S.A. Case Postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | [2005/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cardillo, Marco Ch. des Epinettes 5 1007 Lausanne / DE | 02 /
Lambercy, Edmond Rte de la Maladière 22 1022 Chavannes-près-Renens / CH | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | Poirier, Jean-Michel Serge Bobst S.A., Case postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | [2006/05] |
Former [2005/13] | Savoye, Jean-Paul, et al Moinas & Savoye S.A., 42, rue Plantamour 1201 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 04405551.5 | 06.09.2004 | [2005/13] | Priority number, date | EP20030405692 | 23.09.2003 Original published format: EP 03405692 | [2005/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1518803 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1518803 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65H9/10 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
B65H9/103 (EP);
B65H19/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/13] | Title | German: | Positionierungsvorrichtung für Bögen in der Zuführstation einer Verarbeitungsmaschine | [2005/13] | English: | Sheet positioning device in a feeding station of a treatment machine | [2005/13] | French: | Dispositif de positionnement de feuilles dans une station d'introduction d'une machine de traitement | [2005/13] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 08.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | 25.08.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 18.12.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.10.2009 | CH | 21.10.2009 | CY | 21.10.2009 | CZ | 21.10.2009 | DK | 21.10.2009 | EE | 21.10.2009 | FI | 21.10.2009 | IE | 21.10.2009 | LI | 21.10.2009 | NL | 21.10.2009 | PL | 21.10.2009 | RO | 21.10.2009 | SE | 21.10.2009 | SI | 21.10.2009 | SK | 21.10.2009 | BG | 21.01.2010 | GR | 22.01.2010 | PT | 22.02.2010 | HU | 22.04.2010 | LU | 06.09.2010 | BE | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | [2015/36] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
CH | 21.10.2009 | ||
CY | 21.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
EE | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 21.10.2009 | ||
LI | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
RO | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SK | 21.10.2009 | ||
BG | 21.01.2010 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
HU | 22.04.2010 | ||
LU | 06.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
CH | 21.10.2009 | ||
CY | 21.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
EE | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 21.10.2009 | ||
LI | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
RO | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SK | 21.10.2009 | ||
BG | 21.01.2010 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
HU | 22.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
CH | 21.10.2009 | ||
CY | 21.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
EE | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 21.10.2009 | ||
LI | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
RO | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SK | 21.10.2009 | ||
BG | 21.01.2010 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/22] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
CH | 21.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
EE | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 21.10.2009 | ||
LI | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
RO | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SK | 21.10.2009 | ||
BG | 21.01.2010 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
CZ | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
EE | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
RO | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SK | 21.10.2009 | ||
BG | 21.01.2010 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
CZ | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
EE | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
RO | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SK | 21.10.2009 | ||
BG | 21.01.2010 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
CZ | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
EE | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
RO | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SK | 21.10.2009 | ||
BG | 21.01.2010 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
CZ | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
EE | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
RO | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SK | 21.10.2009 | ||
BG | 21.01.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
CZ | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
EE | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
RO | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
BG | 21.01.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
EE | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
RO | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
BG | 21.01.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 21.10.2009 | |
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 21.10.2009 | |
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4591143 (JESCHKE WILLI [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,8 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 55; figures 1,2 * [A] 2; | [XA]US4635925 (POLLICH GERHARD [DE]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 34 - column 6, line 7; figures 1-8 * [A] 2; | [DA]US4989855 (POLIC GEORGES [CH]) [DA] 1 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 40; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5626458 (BETTINELLI FABIO [CH], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 7 - column 2, line 41; figures 1-4 ** column 5, line 6 - column 8, line 27 *; | [XA]US6264196 (LOETSCH KURT [DE]) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 42 - column 4, line 6; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,6 |