EP1516816 - Method and apparatus for sealing food containers. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ideacorp AG Rothusstrasse 5b 6331 Hünenberg / CH | [2005/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tüns, Heinz-Josef Bergstrasse 19 8447 Dachsen / CH | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Bremi, Tobias Hans, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Bremi, Tobias, Dr., et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 04405576.2 | 14.09.2004 | [2005/12] | Priority number, date | CH20030001616 | 22.09.2003 Original published format: CH 16162003 | [2005/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1516816 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1516816 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65B7/28, B65B51/22, B29C65/08 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
B65B51/225 (EP);
B29C65/08 (EP);
B29C65/18 (EP);
B29C65/72 (EP);
B29C66/112 (EP);
B29C66/131 (EP);
B29C66/24249 (EP);
B29C66/53461 (EP);
B29C66/7392 (EP);
B29C66/80 (EP);
B29C66/8167 (EP);
B29C66/81811 (EP);
B29C66/81812 (EP);
B29C66/849 (EP);
B29C66/91421 (EP);
B29C66/91431 (EP);
B29C66/91645 (EP);
B29C66/91651 (EP);
B29C66/919 (EP);
B29C66/9241 (EP);
B29C66/929 (EP);
B65B7/2878 (EP);
B29C65/26 (EP);
B29C65/30 (EP);
B29C65/32 (EP);
B29C66/0044 (EP);
B29C66/549 (EP);
B29C66/8122 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/8122, B29K2827/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Versiegelung von Nahrungsmittelbehältern | [2007/10] | English: | Method and apparatus for sealing food containers. | [2005/12] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le scellage de récipients à denrées alimentaires. | [2005/12] |
Former [2005/12] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Versiegelung von Nahrungsmittelbhältern | Examination procedure | 08.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 02.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.07.2007 | CZ | 25.07.2007 | DK | 25.07.2007 | EE | 25.07.2007 | FI | 25.07.2007 | GB | 25.07.2007 | IE | 25.07.2007 | NL | 25.07.2007 | PL | 25.07.2007 | RO | 25.07.2007 | SI | 25.07.2007 | SK | 25.07.2007 | TR | 25.07.2007 | LU | 14.09.2007 | BE | 30.09.2007 | IT | 30.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | BG | 25.10.2007 | SE | 25.10.2007 | GR | 26.10.2007 | ES | 05.11.2007 | PT | 26.12.2007 | HU | 26.01.2008 | FR | 21.03.2008 | [2011/12] |
Former [2009/44] | CY | 25.07.2007 | |
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
TR | 25.07.2007 | ||
LU | 14.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
HU | 26.01.2008 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 25.07.2007 | |
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
LU | 14.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 25.07.2007 | |
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 25.07.2007 | |
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 25.07.2007 | |
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | CZ | 25.07.2007 | |
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 25.07.2007 | |
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 25.07.2007 | |
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 25.07.2007 | |
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
GB | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 25.07.2007 | |
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 25.07.2007 | |
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | FI | 25.07.2007 | |
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 25.07.2007 | |
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 05.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0074343 (ESSELTEPACK AB [SE]) [A] 1,3,7,10,14 * page 10, line 19 - page 11, line 18; figure - *; | [Y]DE3447771 (FIT CONTAINER [CH]) [Y] 2,11 * page 16, line 14 - page 18, line 15; figure - *; | [XY]EP0344137 (HAUSTRUP PLASTIC AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,3,10 * column 8, line 7 - line 29; figure -; claim - * [Y] 2,7,11,14; | [A]US5096052 (RAQUE GLEN F [US], et al); | [A]US5345747 (RAQUE GLEN F [US], et al) [A] 5 * column 8, line 34 - line 46; figure - *; | [A]GB2322825 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [Y]EP1110701 (MIRET GAYET XAVIER [ES]) [Y] 7,14 * column 4, line 11 - line 54; figure - * |