EP1522550 - Method for joining two workpieces without the use foreign material and joined workpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weidmann Plastics Technology AG Neue Jonastrasse 60 8640 Rapperswil / CH | [2005/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gmür, Max Winklen 702 9607 Mosnang / CH | [2005/15] | Representative(s) | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/15] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 04405620.8 | 05.10.2004 | [2005/15] | Priority number, date | CH20030001717 | 09.10.2003 Original published format: CH 17172003 | [2005/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1522550 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1522550 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/12, B29C59/00, B29C65/64, B29C65/00, B29C71/04 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
B29C66/9141 (EP,US);
B29C59/16 (EP,US);
B29C65/004 (EP,US);
B29C65/006 (EP,US);
B29C65/64 (EP,US);
B29C66/001 (EP,US);
B29C66/02 (EP,US);
B29C66/026 (EP,US);
B29C66/03 (EP,US);
B29C66/54 (EP,US);
B29C66/731 (EP,US);
B29C66/73111 (EP,US);
B29C66/7315 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/9161 (EP,US);
B29C66/919 (EP,US);
B29C66/91921 (EP,US);
B29C66/929 (EP,US);
C08J5/121 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0827 (EP,US);
B29C59/165 (EP,US);
B29C66/0018 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/73112 (EP);
B29C66/742 (EP);
B29C66/744 (EP);
B29C66/7461 (EP);
B29C66/7465 (EP);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
B29K2023/00 (EP,US);
B29K2033/12 (EP,US);
B29K2705/00 (EP,US);
B29K2709/00 (EP,US);
B29K2709/02 (EP,US);
B29K2709/08 (EP,US);
B29L2031/756 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31938 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/0018, B29C65/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/02, B29C59/16 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/38 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2005/15] | C08J5/12, B29C71/04, B29C65/00, B29C65/64 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/25] |
Former [2005/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum fremdstofffreien Fugen zweier Werkstücke sowie nach diesem Verfahren gefugtes Werkstück | [2005/15] | English: | Method for joining two workpieces without the use foreign material and joined workpiece | [2005/15] | French: | Procédé de liaison sans usage de matière étrangère de deux pièces de travail et pièce de travail assemblée | [2005/15] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/42] | 24.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4803021 (WERTH DENNIS L [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, lines 35-40 * * column 3, lines 37-39 *; | [XI]US5421953 (NAGAKUBO MASAO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * [I] 4,6,7,9-13; | [A]US5500459 (HAGEMEYER ALFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,12 * claim - *; | [A]EP0769517 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPH1092702 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN) [A] 1,6,10,11 * abstract *; | [A]US5846638 (MEISSNER HELMUTH E [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 5, lines 21-39 * * column 10, lines 9-12 * * column 13, lines 35-47 *; | [A]WO0121384 (NEYER ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1,13 * abstract *; | [XP]WO2004078460 (KURARAY CO [JP], et al) [XP] 1-3,5,6,12,13 * abstract *; | [E]EP1604804 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [E] 1-3,5,6,12,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0025] , [0028] , [0029] , [0031] , [0032] , [0034] , [0035] , [0053] , [0058] , [0059]; figure 1; claims 1,5,6,8 *; | EP1849580 [ ] (KURARAY CO [JP]) |