EP1557220 - Apparatus for dispensing a cooled carbonated beverage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/30] | Apparatus for dispensing a carbonated beverage | ||
[2008/37] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mosulet, Michael Lerchenweg 6/1 88287 Grünkraut / DE | [2005/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Liebetanz, Michael, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2005/30] | Liebetanz, Michael, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 04405804.8 | 28.12.2004 | [2005/30] | Priority number, date | CH20030002225 | 30.12.2003 Original published format: CH 22252003 | [2005/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1557220 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1557220 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/04, B67D1/00, B01F13/08, B01F15/00 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
B67D1/0066 (EP);
B01F23/2332 (EP);
B01F23/2362 (EP);
B01F23/23762 (EP);
B01F23/237621 (EP);
B01F33/4535 (EP);
B01F35/2112 (EP);
B01F35/2113 (EP);
B01F35/2209 (EP);
B01F35/2211 (EP);
B01F35/92 (EP);
B67D1/0869 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Abgabe eines gekühlten kohlensäurehaltigen Getränks | [2008/37] | English: | Apparatus for dispensing a cooled carbonated beverage | [2008/37] | French: | Installation pour délivrer une boisson carbonatée refroidie | [2008/37] |
Former [2005/30] | Vorrichtung zur Abgabe eines kohlensäurehaltigen Getränks | ||
Former [2005/30] | Apparatus for dispensing a carbonated beverage | ||
Former [2005/30] | Installation pour délivrer une boisson carbonatée | Examination procedure | 21.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 16.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/38] | 18.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/38] | Public notification(s) | Feststellung eines Rechtsverlusts nach Regel 112(1) EPÜ (EPA Form 2524 vom 25/03/2022) | Mosulet, Michael Lerchenweg 6/1 88287 Grünkraut / DE | [2022/19] | Mitteilung gemäß Regel 142 EPÜ (Wiederaufnahme des Verfahrens nach Regel 142 (2) EPÜ vom 21.12.2020) | Mosulet, Michael Lerchenweg 6/1 88287 Grünkraut / DE | [2021/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 11   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 12   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 13   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 14   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 15   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 16   M06   Not yet paid | 01.06.2021 | 17   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2021 | 18   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 30.12.2008 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: applicant has died | [2009/12] | 01.06.2021 | Resumption of proceedings | [2020/47] | 30.12.2008 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: applicant has died | [2020/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5073312 (BURROWS BRUCE D [US]) [X] 4,7,8 * column 1, lines 5-39 * * column 5, lines 23-68 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0802155 (DUESSELDORF STADTWERKE [DE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]DE19742301 (ASAL HANS [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 4, lines 55-66 * * column 9, line 27 - column 10, line 58 * * column 12, lines 35-38 * * abstract *; | [DX]EP0990863 (BIANIC PHILIPPE [FR]) [DX] 1-3 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0035] * * abstract *; | [A]DE10025381 (KURZER BRITTA [DE], et al) [A] 4-8 * paragraph [0030] * * abstract *; | [A]WO02051739 (EBAC LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US2003053371 (SCHOEB RETO [CH]) [A] 6 * figures 15,16 *; | [A]WO03064024 (DISPERSE LTD [GB], et al) [A] 5,6 * figures 2,3 *; | [PA]US2004218468 (TERENTIEV ALEXANDRE N [US]) [PA] 4-8* abstract *; | [E]EP1514836 (CELLI SPA [IT]) [E] 4,7,8 * paragraphs [0012] - [0015] * * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] * * abstract * |