EP1557501 - Treated water delivery assembly, faucet and feeding pipe therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nobili, Fabrizio Zona Industriale 6534 San Vittore / CH | [2005/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Zardi, Marco, et al M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Zardi, Marco, et al M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | ||
Former [2006/41] | Zardi, Marco, et al M. Zardi & Co. SA Via G.B. Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | ||
Former [2005/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/30] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04425045.4 | 26.01.2004 | [2005/30] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1557501 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/04, F16L33/00 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
F16L39/005 (EP,US);
E03C1/0409 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Abgabe von aufbereitetem Wasser, Hahn und Versorgungsrohr dafür | [2005/30] | English: | Treated water delivery assembly, faucet and feeding pipe therefor | [2005/30] | French: | Assemblage de distribution de l'eau traitée, robinet et tuyau d'alimentation associé | [2005/30] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 03.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/07] | 13.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.07.2006 | 31.01.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1253959 (ELEKTRON CO MBH [DE], et al) [Y] 9 * page 1, line 80 - page 2, line 24; figure 1 *; | [A]DE2539210 (PRUEFLING GERHARD DIPL ING) [A] 8* figure 5 *; | [DA]US4107046 (CORDER THOMAS E) [DA] 1-3,5,6 * column W *; | [XY]US5735467 (LEE CHENG-CHUNG [TW]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 37; figure - * [Y] 9; | [DX]US6093313 (KRONCKE DOUGLAS W [US], et al) [DX] 2-6 * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 24; figures 1-6 * | by applicant | US712868 | US738486 | US816517 | US3853761 | US4107046 | US4172796 | US4770768 | US4863103 | US5020569 | US5152464 | US5744033 | US5823229 | US5858215 | US5976362 | US6093313 |