Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] |
06.09.2010 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
02.03.2010 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.02.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] |
07.02.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.02.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.09.2006 | Change - representative | published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] |
27.07.2006 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | |
27.07.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.03.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] |
02.03.2006 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.12.2005 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] |
16.09.2005 | Change - representative | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] |
10.06.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] |
27.04.2005 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
27.04.2005 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |