EP1577656 - Method for manufacturing a semiconductor pressure sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via Olivetti 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via Olivetti 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | ||
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Villa, Flavio Francesco Via P. Lambertenghi 23 20159 Milano / IT | 02 /
Barlocchi, Gabriele Via Lucernate 8 20010 Cornaredo / IT | 03 /
Corona, Pietro Via Leopardi 25 20123 Milano / IT | 04 /
Vigna, Benedetto Via S. Angelo 37 85010 Pietrapertosa / IT | 05 /
Baldo, Lorenzo Via Piave 172 20010 Bareggio / IT | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Cerbaro, Elena, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 04425197.3 | 19.03.2004 | [2005/38] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1577656 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1577656 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/00 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
G01L9/0073 (EP,US);
G01L9/0045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/23] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Halbleiterdrucksensor und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [2005/38] | English: | Method for manufacturing a semiconductor pressure sensor | [2005/38] | French: | Capteur de pression semiconducteur et son procédé de fabrication | [2005/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 03.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4993143 (SIDNER DIANE W [US], et al) [X] 13,20 * column 1, lines 23-31; figure 1 * * column 5, lines 34-62 *; | [A]DE4227893 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 16-18 * column 3, lines 12-63; figure 1 *; | [AY]DE10131249 (WACKER SILTRONIC HALBLEITERMAT [DE]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0005] , [0010] , [0011] , [0013] , [0025] , [0029] , [0036] , [0038] , [0041] , [0042] *[Y] 1-5,10-12,18; | [XAY]DE10114036 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 13-15,20 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0012] - [0025] * [A] 6-9 [Y] 1-5,10-12,18; | [AD]EP1324382 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [AD] 6-9 * paragraphs [0018] - [0021] - [0023] - [0026] *; | [YA] - SATO T ET AL, "FABRICATION OF SILICON-ON-NOTHING STRUCTURE BY SUBSTRATE ENGINEERING USING THE EMPTY-SPACE-IN-SILICON FORMATION TECHNIQUE", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PUBLICATION OFFICE JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. TOKYO, JP, (200401), vol. 43, no. 1, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 12 - 18, XP001191452 [Y] 1-5,10-12,18 * page 12, columns 1-2 * * page 17 - page 18 * [A] 6-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.43.12 |