EP1592081 - Microstrip to waveguide transition for millimetric waves embodied in a multilayer printed circuit board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks S.p.A. S.S. 11 Padana Superiore Km 158 20060 Cassina de'Pecchi (MI) / IT | [2008/44] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states Siemens S.p.A. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli 10 20126 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Siemens Mobile Communications S.p.A. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli, 10 20126 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cifelli, Antonio Via Campo del Ponte 4/2 20060 Gessate (MI) / IT | 02 /
Milani, Angelo Giuseppe Via Manzoni, 3 20020 Magnago (MI) / IT | 03 /
Polini, Marco Via XI Febbraio, 29 20090 Vimodrone (MI) / IT | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Weidel, Gottfried, et al Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG COO RTP IPR / Patent Administration 80240 München / DE | [2008/44] | Application number, filing date | 04425300.3 | 29.04.2004 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1592081 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1592081 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01P5/107 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
H01P5/107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/44] | Title | German: | Mikrostreifenleiter-Hohlleiterübergang für in einer Mehrschichtleiterplatte gebildete Millimeterplatte | [2005/44] | English: | Microstrip to waveguide transition for millimetric waves embodied in a multilayer printed circuit board | [2005/44] | French: | Transition entre ligne microruban et guide d'ondes pour ondes millimétriques realiseé en une carte de circuits imprimés multicouche | [2005/44] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 28.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.11.2009 | BE | 18.11.2009 | CY | 18.11.2009 | CZ | 18.11.2009 | DK | 18.11.2009 | EE | 18.11.2009 | FI | 18.11.2009 | NL | 18.11.2009 | PL | 18.11.2009 | RO | 18.11.2009 | SE | 18.11.2009 | SI | 18.11.2009 | SK | 18.11.2009 | TR | 18.11.2009 | BG | 18.02.2010 | GR | 19.02.2010 | PT | 18.03.2010 | IE | 29.04.2010 | LU | 29.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | HU | 19.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
IE | 29.04.2010 | ||
LU | 29.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
IE | 29.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
IE | 29.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
IE | 29.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 18.11.2009 | |
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 18.11.2009 | |
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001177312 ; | [A]JPS592402 ; | [A]JPH10126114 ; | [XAY]EP0874415 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]); | [YD]EP1367668 (SIEMENS INF & COMM NETWORKS [IT]) | by applicant | EP0874415 | EP1280392 | EP1367668 |