EP1593823 - Gas feeding system for an internal combustion engine, having a pressure reducing valve and a pressure regulating solenoid valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METATRON S.p.A. Via dei Lapidari 3 40129 Bologna / IT | [2010/30] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (TO) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ricco, Mario C.R.F. Società Cons. per Azioni Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | 02 /
De Matthaeis, Sisto Luigi C.R.F. Società Cons. per Azioni Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | 03 /
Amorese, Claudio C.R.F. Società Cons. per Azioni Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | 04 /
Manodoro, Dario C.R.F. Società Cons. per Azioni Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | 05 /
Ricco, Raffaele C.R.F. Società Cons. per Azion Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Notaro, Giancarlo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Notaro, Giancarlo c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2005/45] | Notaro, Giancarlo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.r.l. Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 04425309.4 | 03.05.2004 | [2005/45] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1593823 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1593823 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02D19/02 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
F02M21/0239 (EP,US);
F02M21/0233 (EP,US);
F02M21/0242 (EP,US);
F02M21/0245 (EP,US);
G05D16/2097 (EP,US);
F02M21/0209 (EP,US);
Y02T10/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Title | German: | Gaszuführsystem für eine Brennkraftmaschine mit einem Druckablassventil und einem Druckregelmagnetventil | [2005/45] | English: | Gas feeding system for an internal combustion engine, having a pressure reducing valve and a pressure regulating solenoid valve | [2005/45] | French: | Systeme d'alimentation en gaz pour un moteur à combustion interne avec une vanne de réduction de pression et une electrovanne régulant la pression | [2005/45] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 19.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.09.2010 | BE | 01.09.2010 | CY | 01.09.2010 | CZ | 01.09.2010 | DK | 01.09.2010 | EE | 01.09.2010 | FI | 01.09.2010 | HU | 01.09.2010 | PL | 01.09.2010 | RO | 01.09.2010 | SE | 01.09.2010 | SI | 01.09.2010 | SK | 01.09.2010 | TR | 01.09.2010 | BG | 01.12.2010 | GR | 02.12.2010 | ES | 12.12.2010 | PT | 03.01.2011 | GB | 03.05.2011 | IE | 03.05.2011 | LU | 03.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
TR | 01.09.2010 | ||
BG | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
GB | 03.05.2011 | ||
IE | 03.05.2011 | ||
LU | 03.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
BG | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
GB | 03.05.2011 | ||
IE | 03.05.2011 | ||
LU | 03.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
GB | 03.05.2011 | ||
IE | 03.05.2011 | ||
LU | 03.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
GB | 03.05.2011 | ||
IE | 03.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
IE | 03.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 01.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4597364 (YOUNG COLIN G [CA]) [A] 1-3* column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 51; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0420599 (CANADIAN GAS ASS [CA]) [A] 1-3 * page 5, line 14 - page 7, line 43; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]WO9504213 (DYNEX INT PTY LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 1-3 * page 4, line 25 - page 7, line 7; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0863300 (FLORGAS DI DALL AGLIO LORIS [IT]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 25 - column 6, line 58; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0894968 (SEIMA ITALIANA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0964145 (SEIMA ITALIANA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6267105 (BERTOSSI BRUNO [IT]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 36; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1209336 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [Y] 1-3 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021]; figure 1 * |