EP1593354 - Shape memory shutter device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (TO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (TO) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perlo, Piero Via Chichignolo 19 12048 Sommariva Bosco (Torino) / IT | 02 /
Grasso, Valentina Via XXIV Maggio 14 10041 Carignano (Torino) / IT | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Notaro, Giancarlo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Notaro, Giancarlo c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2005/45] | Notaro, Giancarlo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.r.l. Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 04425313.6 | 03.05.2004 | [2005/45] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1593354 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1593354 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00, A61F5/451 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
A61F2/0022 (EP,US);
A61F5/0093 (EP,US);
A61F5/451 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0014 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Title | German: | Verschlussvorrichtung bestehend aus Formgedächtnismaterial | [2005/45] | English: | Shape memory shutter device | [2005/45] | French: | Dispositif d'obturateur à mémoire de forme | [2005/45] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 28.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2006 | BE | 26.07.2006 | CH | 26.07.2006 | CY | 26.07.2006 | CZ | 26.07.2006 | EE | 26.07.2006 | FI | 26.07.2006 | LI | 26.07.2006 | NL | 26.07.2006 | PL | 26.07.2006 | RO | 26.07.2006 | SI | 26.07.2006 | SK | 26.07.2006 | TR | 26.07.2006 | BG | 26.10.2006 | DK | 26.10.2006 | GR | 27.10.2006 | PT | 26.12.2006 | HU | 27.01.2007 | [2013/11] |
Former [2009/44] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CY | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
TR | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
HU | 27.01.2007 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CY | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/41] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 26.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0110685 (ALCHEMIA [US]) [A] 4 * page 12, line 8 - page 15, line 24 ** figures 3A-4B *; | [A]EP1238638 (TOKIN CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2003220621 (ARKINSTALL WILLIAM W [CA]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0031] * |