Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7444543 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2008 | B2 | US2006062046 | 23.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04425436 | 14.06.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1607865 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2013 | B1 | EP1607865 | 21.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04425436 | 14.06.2004 |