EP1655230 - Device and method for changing automatically the size of packs in a conveyor, in particular for an automatic packaging machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KPL Packaging S.p.A. Via San Vitalino, 7 40012 Calderara di Reno (BO) / IT | [2008/12] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states KPL Packaging S.p.A. Via San Vitalino, 7 40012 Calderara di Reno / IT | ||
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states KPL Packaging S.p.A. Via Fattori 4/6 40033 Casalecchio di Reno / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baldanza, Luca c/o KPL Packaging S.p.A. Via Fattori, 4-6 40033 Casalecchio di Reno / IT | 02 /
Cinotti, Andrea c/o KPL Packaging S.p.A. Via Fattori, 4-6 40033 Casalecchio di Reno / IT | 03 /
Bertusi, Giuliano c/o KPL Packaging S.p.A. Via Fattori, 4-6 40033 Casalecchio di Reno / IT | [2008/12] |
Former [2006/19] | 01 /
Baldanza, Luca c/o KPL Packaging Spa Via Fattori, 4-6 40033 Casalecchio di Reno / IT | ||
02 /
Cinotti, Andrea c/o KPL Packaging Spa Via Fattori, 4-6 40033 Casalecchio di Reno / IT | |||
03 /
Bertusi, Giuliano c/o KPL Packaging Spa Via Fattori, 4-6 40033 Casalecchio di Reno / IT | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci, Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | ||
Former [2006/19] | Marchitelli, Mauro c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 04425779.8 | 15.10.2004 | [2006/19] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1655230 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1655230 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65B59/00, B65G17/26 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
B65B25/146 (EP,US);
B65B35/44 (EP);
B65B59/001 (EP,US);
B65B59/005 (EP,US);
B65B59/02 (EP,US);
B65G17/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/24] |
Former [2007/03] | DE, ES, FR, GB | ||
Former [2006/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum automatischen Anpassen eines Förderers, insbesondere für eine automatische Verpackungsmaschine, an die Verpackungsgrösse | [2006/19] | English: | Device and method for changing automatically the size of packs in a conveyor, in particular for an automatic packaging machine | [2006/19] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour ajuster automatiquement un convoyeur, notamment d'une machine d'emballage, aux dimensions des emballages | [2006/19] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2005 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 31.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.04.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   21.04.2007 | 10.04.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3509681 (SASS FRANK J) [Y] 8-10 * column 10, line 50 - column 11, line 39; figures 12,13 *; | [A]US5337887 (GREENWELL JOSEPH D [US], et al) [A] 1,5-7,9* column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 14 *; | [Y]US5465550 (DALL OMO DAVIDE [IT]) [Y] 5-7,9,10 * column 4, lines 13-37; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1067048 (TMC SPA [IT]) [A] 1,9 * claim 7 *; | [XAY]US2002059784 (GAMBERINI GIANLUIGI [IT]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0060] - [0071]; figures 1,2 * [A] 4 [Y] 5-8 |