Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
13.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
01.02.2008 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.01.2008 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
24.08.2007 | First examination report | |
18.08.2007 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
29.12.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 31.01.2007 [2007/05] |
23.11.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.07.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] |
07.04.2006 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] |