Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7921723 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2011 | B2 | US2010132458 | 03.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66794407 | 17.05.2007 | WO2005EP12042 | 10.11.2005 | US58530809 | 10.09.2009 | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7603907 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2009 | B2 | US2007295093 | 27.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP12042 | 10.11.2005 | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101277019B | Global Dossier | 24.06.2013 | B1 | KR20070084231 | 24.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP12042 | 10.11.2005 | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008520260 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP12042 | 10.11.2005 | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1812095 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2016 | B1 | EP1812095 | 01.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP12042 | 10.11.2005 | EP05802243 | 10.11.2005 | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005306021B | Global Dossier | 18.08.2011 | B2 | AU2005306021 | 26.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP12042 | 10.11.2005 | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0517750 | 22.06.2021 | B8 | BRPI0517750 | 03.07.2018 | B1 | BRPI0517750 | 21.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP12042 | 10.11.2005 | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2583789 | 03.09.2013 | C | CA2583789 | 26.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP12042 | 10.11.2005 | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1117463T | 26.04.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP05802243 | 10.11.2005 | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1812095T | 18.04.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP12042 | 10.11.2005 | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA010228 | 30.06.2008 | B1 | EA200701066 | 26.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP12042 | 10.11.2005 | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2568651T | 03.05.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP12042 | 10.11.2005 | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1101144 | 12.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP12042 | 10.11.2005 | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007005864 | 17.10.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP12042 | 10.11.2005 | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1812095T | 29.07.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP12042 | 10.11.2005 | EP05802243 | 10.11.2005 | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1812095T | 30.06.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP12042 | 10.11.2005 | EP05802243 | 10.11.2005 | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006053673 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1658869 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100569304C | 16.12.2009 | C | CN101035577 | 12.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE028827T | 30.01.2017 | T2 | Priority number | Date | EP04425855 | 17.11.2004 |