EP1658869 - Membrane unit, housing of a pressure measuring unit and pressure measuring unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg v.d.H. / DE | [2006/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reiter, Reinhold Via Indipendenza 6b 26013 Crema / IT | 02 /
Caronna, Marco, Dr. Via Emilia Est 297 41100 Modena / IT | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/21] | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04425855.6 | 17.11.2004 | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1658869 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36, G01L19/00 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
A61M1/3639 (EP,US);
A61M1/3641 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/14 (KR);
G01L19/0023 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/21] | Title | German: | Membraneinheit, Gehäuse einer Druckmesseinheit und Druckmesseinheit | [2006/21] | English: | Membrane unit, housing of a pressure measuring unit and pressure measuring unit | [2006/21] | French: | Membrane, boîtier d'un capteur de pression et capteur de pression | [2006/21] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 22.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/29] | 07.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003115965 (MITTELSTEIN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,11,12,14-18 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2003200812 (KUHN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0057] , [0062] , [0066] - [0068]; figures 1a,2,6,7 *; | [DX]US2004050168 (UBERREITER ANDREAS [DE]) [DX] 1-3,5-9,12-18* paragraphs [0081] , [0091]; figure 4 * | by applicant | US5614677 | WO9937983 | US2004050168 |