EP1674607 - Laundry dryer machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Candy S.p.A. Via Missori, 8 20052 Monza (MI) / IT | [2008/20] |
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states CANDY S.p.A. Via Missori, 8 I-20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fumagalli, Silvano via Grigna, 2 20052 Monza / IT | [2006/26] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | Mittler, Enrico Mittler & C. s.r.l., Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04425950.5 | 23.12.2004 | [2006/26] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1674607 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1674607 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/24 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
D06F58/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/10] |
Former [2006/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wäschetrockner | [2006/26] | English: | Laundry dryer machine | [2006/26] | French: | Sèche-linge | [2006/26] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 02.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1390901 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8 * page 2, line 119 - page 3, line 42 *; | [XA]GB2115127 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE) [X] 1,5 * page 2, line 23 - line 110 * [A] 3,6,7; | [X]EP0324653 (CREDA LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 25 - line 50 *; | [X]FR2696196 (CIAPEM [FR]) [X] 1,8* the whole document *; | [XA]EP1108811 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0019] * [A] 3,6,7 |