EP1560038 - Method for reducing angular blur in radar pictures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAAB AB 581 88 Linköping / SE | [2005/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tullsson, Bert-Eric Killinggränd 9 175 45 Järfälla / SE | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Falk, Bengt Saab Bofors Support AB Patents and Trademarks 691 80 Karlskoga / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Falk, Bengt Saab Bofors Support AB Patents and Trademarks 691 80 Karlskoga / SE | ||
Former [2005/31] | Falk, Bengt Saab Bofors Support AB, Patents and Trademarks 691 80 Karlskoga / SE | Application number, filing date | 04445004.7 | 27.01.2004 | [2005/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1560038 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1560038 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/40, // G01S13/42 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
G01S7/403 (EP,US);
G01S7/4026 (EP,US);
G01S7/4034 (EP,US);
G01S13/426 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Title | German: | Methode zur Reduktion von Unschärfe in azimuthaler Richtung in Radar-Bildern | [2005/31] | English: | Method for reducing angular blur in radar pictures | [2005/31] | French: | Procédé pour la réduction de flou en direction angulaire dans des images radar | [2005/31] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 17.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.05.2012 | 29.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2006 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.01.2004 | AT | 15.08.2012 | BE | 15.08.2012 | CY | 15.08.2012 | CZ | 15.08.2012 | DK | 15.08.2012 | EE | 15.08.2012 | FI | 15.08.2012 | NL | 15.08.2012 | RO | 15.08.2012 | SE | 15.08.2012 | SI | 15.08.2012 | SK | 15.08.2012 | TR | 15.08.2012 | BG | 15.11.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | PT | 17.12.2012 | IE | 27.01.2013 | LU | 27.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
IE | 27.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
IE | 27.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3710384 (ASHCRAFT W) [A] * column 2, lines 22-37 *; | [X]US5831570 (AMMAR DANNY F [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 3, lines 33-56 * * column 15, line 31 - column 16, line 19 * * column 28, line 41 - column 31, line 46 *; | [A]EP0899582 (DELCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [A] * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0011] - [0014] *; | [A]US6201496 (LEE HENRY E [US]) |