15.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
13.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] |
19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
21.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
14.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
07.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
29.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] |
08.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] |
11.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] |
04.02.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] |
04.02.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] |
21.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
14.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] |
17.12.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] |
12.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] |
15.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] |
08.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] |
20.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] |
06.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
26.02.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] |
23.02.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.02.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.10.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.11.2008 |
First examination report |
|
25.11.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.08.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
04.07.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
06.06.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
05.06.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.11.2007 |
Publication of search report |
published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] |
15.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.05.2006 |
Change - representative |
published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] |
04.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] |