EP1510590 - Method of making tools or components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seco Tools AB 737 82 Fagersta / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states SECO TOOLS AB S-737 82 Fagersta / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruhn, Johnny Langsjö Gard 737 70 Västerfärnebo / SE | 02 /
Löwdin, Evert Prästkragevägen 27 737 42 Fagersta / SE | 03 /
Rostvall, Tomas Selmedalsringen 8 129 36 Stockholm / SE | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel Sandvik AB Intellectual Property 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel Sandvik AB, Intellectual Property 811 81 Sandviken / SE | ||
Former [2005/09] | Taquist, Lennart Sandvik AB, Intellectual Property 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Application number, filing date | 04445086.4 | 25.08.2004 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | SE20030002315 | 27.08.2003 Original published format: SE 0302315 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1510590 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1510590 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | [2009/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1510590 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/05, C04B35/56, C04B35/634 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
B22F3/225 (EP,US);
B22F1/10 (EP,US);
B22F3/1025 (EP,US);
B22F3/227 (EP,US);
C04B35/5626 (EP,US);
C04B35/62655 (EP,US);
C04B35/632 (EP,US);
C04B35/634 (EP,US);
C04B35/63408 (EP,US);
C04B35/63416 (EP,US);
C04B35/638 (EP,US);
C04B35/64 (EP,US);
C04B35/6455 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3839 (EP,US);
C04B2235/405 (EP,US);
C04B2235/424 (EP,US);
C04B2235/449 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6021 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6022 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F3/225 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00, B22F3/227 (US,EP);
B22F2998/00, C22C1/051 (US,EP);
B22F2998/10, B22F9/04, B22F9/026 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Werkzeugen oder Komponenten | [2011/26] | English: | Method of making tools or components | [2005/09] | French: | Procédé de production d'outils ou de composants | [2005/09] |
Former [2005/09] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Werkzeugen oder Komponente | Examination procedure | 11.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2004 | BE | 16.11.2011 | CY | 16.11.2011 | CZ | 16.11.2011 | DK | 16.11.2011 | EE | 16.11.2011 | FI | 16.11.2011 | NL | 16.11.2011 | PL | 16.11.2011 | RO | 16.11.2011 | SI | 16.11.2011 | SK | 16.11.2011 | TR | 16.11.2011 | BG | 16.02.2012 | GR | 17.02.2012 | ES | 27.02.2012 | PT | 16.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 16.11.2011 | |
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | NL | 16.11.2011 | |
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0443048 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-7,10 * examples 1-5 * * page 3, lines 56,57 * * abstract *; | [DA]WO9818973 (SANDVIK AB [SE], et al) [DA] 1-7,10 * page 5, lines 4-24 * * examples 1,2 * * claim 1 *; | [PA]EP1426456 (SECO TOOLS AB [SE]) [PA] 1-5,7-10 * paragraph [0003] * * examples 1,2 * * paragraphs [0019] , [0020]; examples 5,6 * * claim 1 ** abstract * |