EP1607036 - Toolholder mountable on an endoscope and comprising a ring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université Libre de Bruxelles 50, avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [2005/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deviere, Jacques Avenue de Dauphins, 30 B-1470 Genappe / BE | 02 /
Cauche, Nicolas Place de Roi Vainqueur, 28 B-1040 Bruxelles / BE | 03 /
Delchambre, Alain Clos Joseph Hanse, 6 B-1170 Bruxelles / BE | 04 /
Evrard, Sylvie Avenue Albert, 171 B-1190 Bruxelles / BE | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Joëlle, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Van Malderen, Joelle, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 04447144.9 | 18.06.2004 | [2005/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1607036 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/018 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
A61B1/018 (EP,US);
A61B1/00087 (EP,US);
A61B1/0014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/35] |
Former [2005/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Auf einem Endoskop montierbarer und mit Ring versehener Instrumentenhalter | [2005/51] | English: | Toolholder mountable on an endoscope and comprising a ring | [2005/51] | French: | Support d' instruments comprenant une bague et montable sur un endoscope | [2005/51] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/11] | 25.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.07.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003245241 ; | [X]US6179776 (ADAMS RONALD [US], et al) [X] 1-6,11,13,14,16,17,22,15 * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 23; figures 2-5; claim 1 * * column 12, line 1 - column 12, line 22 *; | [DA]US6352503 (MATSUI RAIFU [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * figures 1,5 *; | [A]US2003114732 (WEBLER WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 1* figure 4b * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003245241 A 20030902 (FUJI PHOTO OPTICAL CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |