EP1445242 - Coating for façades [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wopfinger Baustoffindustrie GmbH Wopfing 156 2754 Waldegg / AT | [2004/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lorenz, Jürgen Meitzgasse 15-5 2753 Markt-Piesting / AT | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | Pawloy, Peter Michael, et al Sonn Patentanwälte OG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Pawloy, Peter Michael, et al Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2004/33] | Rippel, Andreas, et al Maxingstrasse 34 1130 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 04450023.9 | 05.02.2004 | [2004/33] | Priority number, date | AT20030000183 | 06.02.2003 Original published format: AT 1832003 | [2004/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1445242 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1445242 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/26, C04B41/50 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
C04B28/26 (EP);
C09D1/04 (EP);
C04B2111/00482 (EP);
C04B2111/00517 (EP);
C04B2111/2038 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/26, C04B14/06, C04B14/062, C04B20/0048, C04B24/243, C04B24/26, C04B24/383, C04B2103/408, C04B2103/65 (EP);
C04B28/26, C04B14/06, C04B14/062, C04B20/0048, C04B24/243, C04B24/26, C04B24/383, C04B24/42, C04B2103/65 (EP) |
Former IPC [2004/33] | C04B28/26, C04B41/50, // C04B28/26, C04B14/06, C04B20/00, C04B24/08, C04B24/24, C04B24/38, C04B24/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/33] | Title | German: | Putz bzw. Beschichtung für Fassaden | [2004/33] | English: | Coating for façades | [2004/33] | French: | Revêtement pour des façades | [2004/33] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 04.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.11.2008 | DK | 26.11.2008 | EE | 26.11.2008 | FI | 26.11.2008 | IE | 26.11.2008 | LU | 05.02.2009 | BG | 26.02.2009 | SE | 26.02.2009 | GR | 27.02.2009 | BE | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | PT | 27.04.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | DK | 26.11.2008 | |
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 26.11.2008 | ||
LU | 05.02.2009 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | DK | 26.11.2008 | |
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 26.11.2008 | ||
IT | 05.02.2009 | ||
LU | 05.02.2009 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | DK | 26.11.2008 | |
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 26.11.2008 | ||
IT | 05.02.2009 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | DK | 26.11.2008 | |
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
GR | 27.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | DK | 26.11.2008 | |
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | DK | 26.11.2008 | |
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
SE | 26.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 27.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | DK | 26.11.2008 | |
EE | 26.11.2008 | ||
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | DK | 26.11.2008 | |
FI | 26.11.2008 | ||
IE | 26.11.2008 | ||
BG | 26.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 26.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB652766 (JOHN HENRY PLESS) [A] * page 1, lines 5-83 *; | [AD]EP0196602 (COLFIRMIT MARTHAHUTTE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0285771 (BENCKISER KNAPSACK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,2 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 18 * * example 1 *; | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS + INDEXES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (19911230), ISSN 0009-2258, XP000283038 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS + INDEXES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (19860811), ISSN 0009-2258, XP000213297 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS + INDEXES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (19781225), vol. 26, no. 89, ISSN 0009-2258, XP000063944 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS + INDEXES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (19870126), ISSN 0009-2258, XP000064565 [A] 1,2 * abstract * |