EP1530988 - Device to manually grind and sharpen edges on running surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schachermayer, Alfred Dorf 6 3352 St. Peter/Au / AT | [2005/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/20] | Application number, filing date | 04450203.7 | 04.11.2004 | [2005/20] | Priority number, date | AT20030078220U | 07.11.2003 Original published format: AT 7822003 U | [2005/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1530988 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1530988 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1530988 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A63C11/06 | [2005/20] | CPC: |
B24B23/02 (EP);
A63C11/06 (EP);
B24B3/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [2006/07] |
Former [2005/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum händischen Schleifen und Schärfen von Laufflächenkanten | [2005/20] | English: | Device to manually grind and sharpen edges on running surfaces | [2005/20] | French: | Appareil pour meuler et affuter manuellement les carres de la semelle | [2005/20] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 26.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2007/50] | deleted | ||
Former [2007/43] | IT | 04.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH257128 (COLOMB PIERRE [CH]) [A] 1,4* figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]DE8122254U (GROPP, HEINRICH, 7516 KARLSBAD, DE) [A] 1-3 * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE3026776 (FINSTERWALD MARTIN [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * page 7, line 10 - page 10, line 21; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0058983 (FINSTERWALD MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [Y]CH661876 (HANS ROELLI) [Y] 1-3,5,4 * page 3, line 45 - page 3, line 46; figures 1,4,5 * * page 3, line 75 - page 3, line 87 * |