EP1502965 - Free cutting brass alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kovohute Celakovice, a.s. Krizikova 270 250 88 Celakovice / CZ | For all designated states VUK Panenske Brezany, s.r.o. Panenske Brezany 50 250 70 Odolena Voda / CZ | [2005/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strachovsky, Antonin Majakovskeho 1223/10 250 88 Celakovice / CZ | 02 /
Faltus, Jiri Lamacova 916 152 00 Praha 5 / CZ | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Belfin, Vladimir Amalska 6 P.O. Box 117 272 00 Kladno / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Belfin, Vladimir Amalska 6 P.O. Box 117 272 00 Kladno / CZ | Application number, filing date | 04466021.5 | 29.07.2004 | [2005/05] | Priority number, date | CZ20030002094 | 01.08.2003 Original published format: CZ 20032094 | [2005/05] | Filing language | CS | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1502965 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C22C9/04 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
C22C9/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/05] | Extension states | LT | 07.07.2005 | Title | German: | Messing mit guter Zerspanbarkeit. | [2005/05] | English: | Free cutting brass alloy | [2005/05] | French: | Laiton à usinage facile. | [2005/05] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 10.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/24] | 24.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2001059123 ; | [X]JP7310133 ; | [X]JP2002003967 ; | [X]JP2002030364 ; | [XP]JP2003277855 ; | [X]EP0457478 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6 * column 2, line 56 - line 64 * * column 4 * * column 7, line 57 - line 67 * * table 4 *; | [X]US5637160 (BROCK ANDREW J [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * claims 1,6,7,9,10 *; | [Y]EP1038981 (SAMBO COPPER ALLOY CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 4 * page 3, line 5 - line 28 ** page 13; table 6 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010710), vol. 2000, no. 20, & JP2001059123 A 20010306 (HITACHI ALLOY KK; HITACHI CABLE LTD) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * page 4; table 1 * * page 4; table 1 * [Y] 4 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP7310133 A 19951128 (CHUETSU GOKIN CHUKO KK) [X] 1,3-6 * abstract * * tables 2,3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020503), vol. 2002, no. 05, & JP2002003967 A 20020109 (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND LTD; SHINNITTO KINZOKU KK) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * tables 1,3,5,7 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0016] * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020503), vol. 2002, no. 05, & JP2002030364 A 20020131 (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND LTD; SHINNITTO KINZOKU KK) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * tables 1-3 * | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003277855 A 20031002 (SAN-ETSU METALS CO LTD) [XP] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * tables 1,2 * |