EP1588448 - FUEL CELL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A FUELL CELL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/16] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUTENRIETH, Rainer L. Mueller Str. 4 71723 Grossbottwar / DE | [2005/43] | Application number, filing date | 04700010.4 | 30.12.2003 | [2005/43] | WO2004DE00002 | Priority number, date | DE2002161418 | 30.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10261418 | [2005/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004064185 | Date: | 29.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1588448 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1588448 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
H01M8/0494 (EP,US);
B60L58/30 (EP,US);
H01M16/006 (EP,US);
H01M8/04947 (EP,US);
H01M2250/20 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/52] |
Former [2005/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEMS | [2005/43] | English: | FUEL CELL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A FUELL CELL SYSTEM | [2005/43] | French: | SYSTEME DE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE ET PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE SYSTEME DE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE | [2005/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 12.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4962462 (FEKETE IMRE [US]) [X] 1,3,7-13,15 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19731250 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,7-13,15 * claims 1-9 *; | [X]EP0701294 (BRITISH GAS PLC [GB]) [X] 1,3,7-13 * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 3; claims 13,14 *; | [X]WO9946140 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,7-13,15 * page 12, paragraph 1; claims 1-8 *; | [A]DE10109872 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claim 4 *; | [A]DE4329323 (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |