EP1581364 - METHOD FOR THE PARALLAX-FREE CENTRING OF AN OPTICAL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/40] | METHOD FOR THE PARALLAX-FREE CENTRING OF AN OPTICAL ELEMENT AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | ||
[2006/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Vision GmbH Turnstrasse 27 73430 Aalen / DE | [2005/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAISER, Michael Schelmenstrasse 27 73560 Böbingen / DE | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Werner, et al Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Lorenz, Werner, et al Lorenz & Kollegen, Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04700094.8 | 03.01.2004 | [2005/40] | WO2004EP00012 | Priority number, date | DE2003100777 | 11.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10300777 | [2005/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004062848 | Date: | 29.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1581364 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1581364 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B24B13/005, B24B9/14, G02C13/00 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
G02C13/005 (EP,US);
B24B13/0055 (EP,US);
B24B9/146 (EP,US);
G02C13/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PARALLAXEFREIEN ZENTRIERUNG EINES OPTISCHEN ELEMENTES | [2006/46] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PARALLAX-FREE CENTRING OF AN OPTICAL ELEMENT | [2006/46] | French: | PROCEDE DE CENTRAGE SANS PARALLAXE D'UN ELEMENT OPTIQUE | [2006/46] |
Former [2005/40] | VERFAHREN ZUR PARALLAXEFREIEN ZENTRIERUNG EINES OPTISCHEN ELEMENTES UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | ||
Former [2005/40] | METHOD FOR THE PARALLAX-FREE CENTRING OF AN OPTICAL ELEMENT AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | ||
Former [2005/40] | PROCEDE DE CENTRAGE SANS PARALLAXE D'UN ELEMENT OPTIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DESTINE A LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCEDE | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 18.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.03.2007 | CZ | 14.03.2007 | DK | 14.03.2007 | EE | 14.03.2007 | FI | 14.03.2007 | GB | 14.03.2007 | IE | 14.03.2007 | NL | 14.03.2007 | RO | 14.03.2007 | SI | 14.03.2007 | SK | 14.03.2007 | TR | 14.03.2007 | BG | 14.06.2007 | SE | 14.06.2007 | GR | 15.06.2007 | ES | 25.06.2007 | PT | 14.08.2007 | HU | 15.09.2007 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 14.03.2007 | |
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
BG | 14.06.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
HU | 15.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CY | 14.03.2007 | |
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
BG | 14.06.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 14.03.2007 | |
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 14.03.2007 | |
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | FI | 14.03.2007 | |
GB | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 14.03.2007 | |
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | FI | 14.03.2007 | |
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
ES | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | FI | 14.03.2007 | |
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [DX]DE3829488 (WERNICKE & CO GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-5 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 55 *; | [X]EP0865871 (HOYA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5 * page 11, lines 23-30 *; | [X]DE19804542 (WERNICKE & CO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * column 5, lines 30-67 *; | [E]WO2004015482 (RODENSTOCK GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1-5* page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 3; figure 1 * |