EP1585705 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF HIGH SURFACE AREA METAL FLUORIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanofluor GmbH Brook-Taylor-Strasse 2 12489 Berlin / DE | [2013/15] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Nanofluor GmbH Brook-Taylor-Strasse 2 12489 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states Humboldt-Universität zu Berlin Unter den Linden 6 D-10099 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEMNITZ, Erhard Prenzlauer Allee 218 10405 Berlin / DE | 02 /
GROSS, Udo Prignitzstr. 32 12683 Berlin / DE | 03 /
RÜDIGER, Stephan Grossmachnower Allee 11 15834 Rangsdorf / DE | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Schulz Junghans Patentanwälte PartGmbB Grossbeerenstrasse 71 10963 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Schulz Junghans Chausseestrasse 5 10115 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2005/42] | Bohmann, Armin K. Bohmann & Loosen, Anwaltssozietät, Sonnenstrasse 8 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04700458.5 | 07.01.2004 | [2005/42] | WO2004EP00049 | Priority number, date | EP20030000221 | 07.01.2003 Original published format: EP 03000221 | US20030438308P | 07.01.2003 Original published format: US 438308 P | EP20030006656 | 25.03.2003 Original published format: EP 03006656 | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004060806 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1585705 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1585705 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C01F7/50, C01F5/28, C01B9/08 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
C07C17/37 (EP,US);
B01J27/12 (EP,US);
B01J27/125 (EP,US);
B01J27/128 (EP,US);
B01J27/138 (EP,US);
B01J35/33 (EP,US);
B01J37/26 (EP,US);
C01B9/08 (EP,US);
C01F5/28 (EP,US);
C01F7/50 (EP,US);
C07C17/087 (EP,US);
C07C17/21 (EP,US);
C07C17/358 (EP,US);
C07C2/68 (EP,US);
C07C45/46 (EP,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,US);
B01J35/615 (EP,US);
B01J35/66 (EP,US);
C01P2002/02 (EP,US);
C01P2002/54 (EP,US);
C01P2002/82 (EP,US);
C01P2002/86 (EP,US);
C01P2004/52 (EP,US);
C01P2004/54 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/14 (EP,US);
C01P2006/16 (EP,US);
C07C2527/125 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/087, C07C19/10 (EP,US);
C07C17/21, C07C19/12 (EP,US);
C07C17/358, C07C19/10 (EP,US);
C07C17/358, C07C19/14 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METALLFLUORIDEN MIT GROSSEROBERFLÄCHE | [2005/42] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF HIGH SURFACE AREA METAL FLUORIDES | [2005/42] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE FLUORURES METALLIQUES A SURFACE ACTIVE ELEVEE | [2005/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 21.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2005 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 11.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.10.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.01.2004 | AT | 10.04.2013 | BE | 10.04.2013 | CY | 10.04.2013 | CZ | 10.04.2013 | DK | 10.04.2013 | EE | 10.04.2013 | FI | 10.04.2013 | MC | 10.04.2013 | RO | 10.04.2013 | SE | 10.04.2013 | SI | 10.04.2013 | SK | 10.04.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.07.2013 | PT | 12.08.2013 | IE | 07.01.2014 | LU | 07.01.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2015/07] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
IE | 07.01.2014 | ||
LU | 07.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
LU | 07.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | SI | 10.04.2013 | |
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 10.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2959557 (HANSFORD ROWLAND C) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 15 - column 1, line 41 * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 20 ** example 1 *; | [X]FR1383927 (DU PONT) [X] 11-18 * example 6 *; | [XA]GB995186 (MONTECANTI SOCIETA GENERALE PE) [X] 11-18 * the whole document * [A] 1-10; | [XD] - DELATTRE J.L. ET AL., "Plasma-Fluorination Synthesis of High Surface Area Aluminum Trifluoride from a Zeolite Precursor", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2001), vol. 123, pages 5364 - 5365, XP002254993 [XD] 11-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja015645t | by applicant | FR1383927 | GB995186 | DE4041771 | US5157171 | - CHOI, J.-B. ET AL., J. KOREAN IND. ENG. CHEM., (200011), vol. 11, no. 8, pages 969 - 973 | - E. KEMNITZ; D.-H. MENZ, PROG. SOLID ST. CHEM., (1998), vol. 26, pages 97 - 153 | - ZIEGLER, K.; KOSTER, R., LIEBIGS ANN. CHEM., (1957), vol. 608, pages 1 - 7 | - DELATTRE, J.L. ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2001), vol. 123, pages 5364 - 5 | - J. L. DELATTRE ET AL., J.AM. CHEM. SOC., (2001), vol. 123, page 5346 |