EP1584101 - SEMICONDUCTOR PACKAGE HAVING NON-CERAMIC BASED WINDOW FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera America, Inc. 8611 Balboa Avenue San Diego, CA 92123-1580 / US | [2005/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENEGAS, Jeffrey 12196 Darkwood Road San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 02 /
GARLAND, Paul 13458 Samantha Avenue San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 03 /
LOBSINGER, Joshua 3437 Waco Street, Unit 1 San Diego, CA 92117 / US | 04 /
LUU, Linda 13327 Betty Lee Way Poway, CA 92064 / US | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/41] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04701262.0 | 09.01.2004 | [2005/41] | WO2004US00621 | Priority number, date | US20030339834 | 10.01.2003 Original published format: US 339834 | [2005/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004064120 | Date: | 29.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1584101 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1584101 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/80, H01K5/00, H05K3/34, H05K7/20, H05K3/30, H01L23/02, H01L23/043, G02B6/00, G02B6/36 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
H01L23/047 (EP,US);
H01L23/14 (KR);
G02B6/36 (KR);
H01L23/02 (KR);
H01L23/04 (KR);
H01L23/057 (EP,US);
H01L23/3675 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05599 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45099 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48137 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85399 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/05599, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/85399, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2005/41] | H01L21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/41] | Extension states | AL | 03.08.2005 | LT | 03.08.2005 | LV | 03.08.2005 | MK | 03.08.2005 | Title | German: | HALBLEITERKAPSELUNG MIT NICHT AUF KERAMIK BASIERENDEM FENSTERRAHMEN | [2005/41] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR PACKAGE HAVING NON-CERAMIC BASED WINDOW FRAME | [2005/41] | French: | BOITIER A SEMICONDUCTEUR POSSEDANT UN CADRE DE FENETRE A BASE NON CERAMIQUE | [2005/41] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 20.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.02.2006 | 31.01.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.02.2007 | 31.01.2011 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.01.2004 | AT | 29.06.2011 | BE | 29.06.2011 | CY | 29.06.2011 | CZ | 29.06.2011 | DK | 29.06.2011 | EE | 29.06.2011 | FI | 29.06.2011 | RO | 29.06.2011 | SE | 29.06.2011 | SI | 29.06.2011 | SK | 29.06.2011 | TR | 29.06.2011 | BG | 29.09.2011 | GR | 30.09.2011 | ES | 10.10.2011 | PT | 31.10.2011 | IE | 09.01.2012 | LU | 09.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
IE | 09.01.2012 | ||
LU | 09.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
IE | 09.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
IE | 09.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
IE | 09.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
IE | 09.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59214243 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [X]US6462413 (POLESE FRANK J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,11-14 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO9515007 (ROGERS CORP [US]); | [X]US6332720 (SHIMAOKA MAKOTO [JP], et al); | [X]US6365961 (TOMIE SATORU [JP]) | by applicant | WO9515007 |