EP1583727 - PROCESS FOR RECOVERY OF 1,1,1,3,3,3-HEXAFLUOROISOPROPANOL FROM THE WASTE STREAM OF SEVOFLURANE SYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) One Baxter Parkway Deerfield Illinois 60015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2017/11] | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) One Baxter Parkway Deerfield Illinois 60015 / US | ||
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) One Baxter Parkway Deerfield Illinois 60015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROZOV, Leonid, A. 35-08 Gardenview Terrace Fair Lawn, NJ 07410 / US | 02 /
LESSOR, Ralph, A. 77 Pearl Street New Providence, NJ 07974 / US | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/11] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2005/41] | Dee, Ian Mark, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04701502.9 | 12.01.2004 | [2005/41] | WO2004US00634 | Priority number, date | US20030439942P | 14.01.2003 Original published format: US 439942 P | [2005/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004065340 | Date: | 05.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1583727 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1583727 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/10, C07C29/124, C07C31/38, C07C41/22, C07C43/12 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
C07C29/124 (EP,US);
C07C29/10 (EP,US);
C07C41/22 (EP,US);
C07C43/123 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/10, C07C31/38 (EP,US);
C07C29/124, C07C31/38 (US,EP);
C07C41/22, C07C43/123 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/41] | C07C29/09, C07C29/10, C07C29/124, C07C31/38, C07C43/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/11] |
Former [2005/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZURÜCKGEWINNUNG VON 1,1,1,3,3,3-HEXAFLUORISOPROPANOL AUS SEVOFLURAN-ABFALLSTRÖMEN | [2005/41] | English: | PROCESS FOR RECOVERY OF 1,1,1,3,3,3-HEXAFLUOROISOPROPANOL FROM THE WASTE STREAM OF SEVOFLURANE SYNTHESIS | [2005/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECUPERATION DE 1,1,1,3,3,3-HEXAFLUOROISOPROPANOL A PARTIR DU FLUX RESIDUEL DE SYNTHESE DE SEVOFLURANE | [2005/41] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 14.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.01.2004 | CY | 15.03.2017 | CZ | 15.03.2017 | DK | 15.03.2017 | EE | 15.03.2017 | ES | 15.03.2017 | FI | 15.03.2017 | MC | 15.03.2017 | NL | 15.03.2017 | RO | 15.03.2017 | SE | 15.03.2017 | SI | 15.03.2017 | SK | 15.03.2017 | TR | 15.03.2017 | BG | 15.06.2017 | GR | 16.06.2017 | PT | 17.07.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 12.01.2004 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
TR | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
TR | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/02] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | FI | 15.03.2017 | |
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5811596 (KAWAI TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [DA] 1,2 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]US6100434 (BIENIARZ CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [DA] 10,22* example -; claim - *; | [X]US6469219 (KHRIMIAN ACHOT PAVLIKOVICH [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 34 - line 65; example 3 * | Examination | - David R. Lide, CRC Handbook of Chemistry and Physics 85th Edition, CRC Press, (2004), pages 8-45 - 8-46 | by applicant | US6469219 |