EP1617941 - QUICK-CLOSING DOOR FOR PRESSURE VESSELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sistem Teknik Endustriyel Elektronik Sis. San. Ve Tic. Ltd. Sti. Des Sanayi Sitesi, 102. Sk. B06 Blok 81260 Dudullu, Istanbul / TR | [2007/24] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states Sistem Teknik Endustriyel Elektronik Sis. San. Vetic. Ltd. Sti. Des Sanayi Sitesi, 102. Sk. B06 Blok 81260 Dudullu, Istanbul / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZDESLIK, Mehmet Des Sanayi Sitesi, 102.Sk. B06 Block 81260 Dudullu, Istanbul / TR | 02 /
SCHMETZ, Peter Mendener Ofenbau&HartereibedarfGmb H Liszt Str.7 58706 Menden / DE | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | LENZING GERBER Patentanwälte Postfach 20 05 09 40103 Düsseldorf / DE | [2006/04] | Application number, filing date | 04701716.5 | 13.01.2004 | [2006/04] | WO2004TR00002 | Priority number, date | TR20030000572 | 30.04.2003 Original published format: TR 200300572 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004096427 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1617941 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1617941 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01J3/03, F16J15/46 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
B01J19/002 (EP,US);
B01J19/0073 (EP,US);
B01J3/03 (EP,US);
F16J13/00 (EP,US);
F16J15/002 (EP,US);
F16J15/46 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00207 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00211 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00225 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00268 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNELLSCHLIESSENDE TÜR FÜR DRUCKBEHÄLTER | [2006/04] | English: | QUICK-CLOSING DOOR FOR PRESSURE VESSELS | [2006/04] | French: | PORTE A FERMETURE RAPIDE POUR RECIPIENTS SOUS PRESSION | [2006/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 19.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.06.2007 | CY | 13.06.2007 | CZ | 13.06.2007 | DK | 13.06.2007 | EE | 13.06.2007 | FI | 13.06.2007 | NL | 13.06.2007 | RO | 13.06.2007 | SI | 13.06.2007 | SK | 13.06.2007 | BG | 13.09.2007 | SE | 13.09.2007 | GR | 14.09.2007 | PT | 13.11.2007 | HU | 14.12.2007 | GB | 13.01.2008 | LU | 13.01.2008 | IE | 14.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | [2010/34] |
Former [2010/33] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
GB | 13.01.2008 | ||
LU | 13.01.2008 | ||
IE | 14.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
GB | 13.01.2008 | ||
IE | 14.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
GB | 13.01.2008 | ||
IE | 14.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
GB | 13.01.2008 | ||
IE | 14.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
GB | 13.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | BE | 13.06.2007 | |
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | SE | 13.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB950440 (HELIOT MAURICE ETS) [X] 1,2* the whole document *; | [A]GB1102945 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED) [A] 2 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2395066 (GAMBINI JOSEPH [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US4469335 (MOORE VINCENT [US]) [X] 2,4 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3337092 (MASCHB SCHOLZ GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | - RADCLIFFE E.J., "Gas quenching in Vacuum Furnaces- A review of Fundamentals", INDUSTRIAL HEATING, (1987), vol. NOVEMBER, pages 33 - 39 | - HEILEMANN P., "Universell und wirtschaftlich-der neue Vakuumofen mit konvektiver Erwärmung und Hochdruck-Gasabschreckung", TECHNISCHE MITTEILUNGEN, DEGUSSA-DURFERRIT |