EP1587383 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR APPLYING HAIR EXTENSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hairlocs, Inc. 6550 Ensign Avenue North Avenue, CA 91606 / US | [2005/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARROYO, Marisol, S. 6550 Ensign Avenue North Hollywood, CA 91606 / US | 02 /
ARROYO, Jose, R. 6550 Ensign Avenue North Hollywood, CA 91606 / US | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 04701808.0 | 13.01.2004 | [2005/43] | WO2004US00866 | Priority number, date | US20030355580 | 30.01.2003 Original published format: US 355580 | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004068984 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1587383 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1587383 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A41G5/00 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
A41G5/0066 (EP,US);
A41G5/0086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR ANBRINGUNG VON HAARVERLÄNGERUNGEN | [2005/43] | English: | METHODS AND DEVICES FOR APPLYING HAIR EXTENSIONS | [2005/43] | French: | PROCEDES ET DISPOSITIFS POUR FIXER DES EXTENSIONS DE CHEVEUX | [2005/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 07.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 09.08.2006 | CH | 09.08.2006 | CY | 09.08.2006 | CZ | 09.08.2006 | EE | 09.08.2006 | FI | 09.08.2006 | LI | 09.08.2006 | NL | 09.08.2006 | RO | 09.08.2006 | SI | 09.08.2006 | SK | 09.08.2006 | TR | 09.08.2006 | BG | 09.11.2006 | DK | 09.11.2006 | SE | 09.11.2006 | GR | 10.11.2006 | PT | 09.01.2007 | LU | 13.01.2007 | IE | 15.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | HU | 10.02.2007 | [2013/49] |
Former [2009/44] | BE | 09.08.2006 | |
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
CY | 09.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
EE | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
RO | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
TR | 09.08.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
LU | 13.01.2007 | ||
IE | 15.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
HU | 10.02.2007 | ||
Former [2009/41] | BE | 09.08.2006 | |
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
CY | 09.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
EE | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
RO | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
LU | 13.01.2007 | ||
IE | 15.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
HU | 10.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | BE | 09.08.2006 | |
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
EE | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
RO | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
IE | 15.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | BE | 09.08.2006 | |
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
RO | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
IE | 15.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | BE | 09.08.2006 | |
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
RO | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
IE | 15.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | BE | 09.08.2006 | |
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
RO | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | BE | 09.08.2006 | |
CH | 09.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CH | 09.08.2006 | |
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 09.08.2006 | |
CZ | 09.08.2006 | ||
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | CH | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | CH | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
LI | 09.08.2006 | ||
SI | 09.08.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2271057 (ADVANCED HAIR STUDIO OF AUSTRA [AU]); | [DA]US5752530 (TRAINTINGER FELIX [AT]) [DA] 1,8 * column W *; | [A]DE20009406U (KERLING HAARFABRIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 8; figure 1 *; | [A]US6109274 (INGERSOLL JACQUELINE DONOVAN [US]) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 9 - line 38; figures 2,3 * |