EP1587962 - AN IMPROVED SMELTING PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF IRON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Outotec Ausmelt Pty Ltd. 12 Kitchen Road Dandenong VIC 3175 / AU | [2010/46] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states AUSMELT LIMITED 12 Kitchen Road Dandenong, VIC 3175 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NG, Colette, Maria 17 Flinders Street Mentone, Victoria 3194 / AU | 02 /
BALDOCK, Brian, Ross 49 McCormicks Road Skye, Victoria 3977 / AU | 03 /
SOFRA, Giuseppe 2/16 Jolimont Terrace East Melbourne, Victoria3002 / AU | 04 /
HUGHES, Stephen, Peter 3 Iluka Street Black Rock, Victoria 3193 / AU | 05 /
MATUSEWICZ, Robert, Walter 23 Abbeygate Street Oakleigh, Victoria 3166 / AU | 06 /
MCCLELLAND, Ross, Alexander 11/24 Turner Street Berwick, Victoria 3806 / AU | 07 /
SHERRINGTON, David, Matthew 51 Walara Drive Mt Martha, Victoria 3934 / AU | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 04703318.8 | 20.01.2004 | [2005/43] | WO2004AU00068 | Priority number, date | AU20030900357 | 24.01.2003 Original published format: AU 2003900357 | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004065641 | Date: | 05.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1587962 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1587962 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1587962 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 05.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C21B11/08, C21B13/10 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
C22B5/10 (EP,US);
C21B11/08 (KR);
C21B13/0013 (EP,US);
C21B13/10 (KR);
C21B3/06 (EP,US);
C21C5/562 (EP,US);
C21B2400/022 (EP,US);
C22B7/04 (EP,US);
Y02P10/134 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES VERHÜTTUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EISEN | [2005/43] | English: | AN IMPROVED SMELTING PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF IRON | [2005/43] | French: | PROCEDE DE FUSION AMELIORE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DU FER | [2005/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 12.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 18.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.07.2010 | DK | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | PT | 29.11.2010 | IE | 20.01.2011 | CH | 31.01.2011 | LI | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2012/08] |
Former [2011/48] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | SI | 28.07.2010 | |
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | SI | 28.07.2010 | |
PT | 29.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US5498277 (FLOYD JOHN M [AU], et al); | [X]EP1067201 (TECH RESOURCES PTY LTD [AU]); | [X]WO0164960 (TECH RESOURCES PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [X]WO0224963 (TECH RESOURCES PTY LTD [AU], et al) |