EP1590384 - COATING MATERIALS, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | [2005/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMGART, Hubert Am Dornbusch 44 A 48162 Münster / DE | 02 /
ROTERS, Annette Derkskamp 79 48163 Münster / DE | 03 /
COOK, Vince Derkskamp 79 48163 Münster / DE | 04 /
FARWICK, Thomas Heckenweg 7 a 48727 Billerbeck / DE | 05 /
HASSE, Sandra Herrenstein 79 b 48317 Drensteinfurt / DE | 06 /
KETTELER, Cornelia Rosenstr. 7 48282 Emsdetten / DE | 07 /
RÖCKRATH, Ulrike Vikarsbusch 8 48308 Senden / DE | [2006/52] |
Former [2005/44] | 01 /
BAUMGART, Hubert Am Dornbusch 44 A 48162 Münster / DE | ||
02 /
ROTERS, Annette Derkskamp 79 48163 Münster / DE | |||
03 /
COOK, Vince Derkskamp 79 48163 Münster / DE | |||
04 /
FARWICK, Thomas Alt - Neu Münsterstrasse 48d 48727 Billerbeck / DE | |||
05 /
HASSE, Sandra Herrenstein 79 b 48317 Drensteinfurt / DE | |||
06 /
KETTELER, Cornelia Rosenstr. 7 48282 Emsdetten / DE | |||
07 /
RÖCKRATH, Ulrike Vikarsbusch 8 48308 Senden / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2006/33] |
Former [2005/44] | Fitzner, Uwe Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04703360.0 | 20.01.2004 | [2005/44] | WO2004EP00392 | Priority number, date | DE2003105119 | 07.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10305119 | [2005/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004069884 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1590384 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1590384 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/00, C08G18/80 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
C08G18/80 (EP,US);
C09D133/14 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D133/14, C08L2666/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSSTOFFE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2005/44] | English: | COATING MATERIALS, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE THEREOF | [2005/44] | French: | MATERIAUX DE REVETEMENT, LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2005/44] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 20.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.09.2007 | CZ | 05.09.2007 | DK | 05.09.2007 | EE | 05.09.2007 | FI | 05.09.2007 | GB | 05.09.2007 | IE | 05.09.2007 | NL | 05.09.2007 | RO | 05.09.2007 | SI | 05.09.2007 | SK | 05.09.2007 | TR | 05.09.2007 | BG | 05.12.2007 | SE | 05.12.2007 | GR | 06.12.2007 | AT | 20.01.2008 | LU | 20.01.2008 | BE | 31.01.2008 | CH | 31.01.2008 | IT | 31.01.2008 | LI | 31.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | PT | 06.02.2008 | HU | 06.03.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 05.09.2007 | |
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
TR | 05.09.2007 | ||
BG | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
AT | 20.01.2008 | ||
LU | 20.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
HU | 06.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 05.09.2007 | |
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
BG | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
AT | 20.01.2008 | ||
LU | 20.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
HU | 06.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 05.09.2007 | |
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
BG | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
AT | 20.01.2008 | ||
LU | 20.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CY | 05.09.2007 | |
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
BG | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
AT | 20.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 05.09.2007 | |
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
AT | 20.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
AT | 20.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
AT | 20.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.01.2008 | ||
LI | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | FI | 05.09.2007 | |
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 05.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH491167 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [PA]WO03037952 (BASF COATINGS AG [DE], et al) [PA] 1-21 * page 28 - page 29; examples 1,2 * |