EP1494097 - MULTI-FUNCTION WATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2008/51] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUKAWA, Tsuneaki Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suwa-shi Nagano 3928502 / JP | 02 /
NAGASAKA, Eiichi Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 3928502 / JP | 03 /
FUKUI, Koji Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suwa-shi Nagano 3928502 / JP | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 04703465.7 | 20.01.2004 | [2005/01] | WO2004JP00398 | Priority number, date | JP20030018806 | 28.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003018806 | JP20030022165 | 30.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003022165 | JP20030022166 | 30.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003022166 | [2005/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004068247 | Date: | 12.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494097 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1494097 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G04F8/02, G04C3/00, G04F7/08 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
G04G21/02 (EP,US);
G04C3/146 (EP,US);
G04F7/0814 (EP,US);
G04F8/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/01] | G04F8/02, G04C3/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2006/20] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONS-ARMBANDUHR | [2005/01] | English: | MULTI-FUNCTION WATCH | [2005/01] | French: | MONTRE MULTIFONCTION | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2004 | Translation filed | 26.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 13.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.12.2008 | NL | 17.12.2008 | [2011/14] |
Former [2009/26] | NL | 17.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH65765 (HORLOGERE RECONVILIER SOC [CH]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2265906 (JACOT GUYOT HENRI) [Y] 10 * page 1, column RIGHT, line 36 - page 2, column L, line 7 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US3457720 (BACHMANN PETER) [A] 10* column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 52 *; | [Y]EP1118915 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 9 * figure 12 * * paragraphs [0139] - [0141] *; | [XY]WO02093273 (ETERNA AG UHRENFABRIK [CH], et al) [X] 1-8 * figure 2 * * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 16 * [Y] 9,10 | International search | [X]JP2595941Y ; | [X]JP2555141Y ; | [Y]EP0361013 (TIMEX CORP [US]); | [Y]JPH056588Y ; | [Y]JPH0530236B ; | [A]JP2605696Y ; | [A]JPS2913590Y | [Y] - CREDOR SEIKO, "Sekai no udedokei", (20020820), no. 58, page 28, XP002904487 | by applicant | WO02093273 |