EP1588374 - FLOATING GATE ANALOG VOLTAGE FEEDBACK CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xicor Inc. 933 Murphy Ranch Road Bldg. 4 Milpitas CA 95035 / US | [2008/39] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states Xicor Inc. 933 Murphy Ranch Road Bldg. 4 Milpitas CA 95035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Owen, William Xicor, Inc., 933 Murphy Ranch Road, Bldg. 4 Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 36 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/43] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04703701.5 | 20.01.2004 | [2005/43] | WO2004US01608 | Priority number, date | US20030348929 | 21.01.2003 Original published format: US 348929 | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004066502 | Date: | 05.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1588374 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1588374 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/34 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
G11C27/005 (EP,US);
G11C16/10 (EP,US);
G11C16/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLOATING-GATE-ANALOGSPANNUNGSRÜCKKOPPLUNGSSCHALTUNG | [2005/43] | English: | FLOATING GATE ANALOG VOLTAGE FEEDBACK CIRCUIT | [2005/43] | French: | CIRCUIT DE RETROACTION DE TENSION ANALOGIQUE A GRILLE FLOTTANTE | [2005/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 09.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.09.2008 | BE | 24.09.2008 | CY | 24.09.2008 | CZ | 24.09.2008 | DK | 24.09.2008 | EE | 24.09.2008 | FI | 24.09.2008 | IT | 24.09.2008 | NL | 24.09.2008 | RO | 24.09.2008 | SI | 24.09.2008 | SK | 24.09.2008 | TR | 24.09.2008 | BG | 24.12.2008 | SE | 24.12.2008 | GR | 25.12.2008 | ES | 04.01.2009 | GB | 20.01.2009 | IE | 20.01.2009 | LU | 20.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | PT | 24.02.2009 | HU | 25.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
GR | 25.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
GB | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 20.01.2009 | ||
LU | 20.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
HU | 25.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
GR | 25.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
GB | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 20.01.2009 | ||
LU | 20.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
GR | 25.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
GB | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 20.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
GB | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 20.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
GB | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 20.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
GB | 20.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6034888 (PASOTTI MARCO [IT], et al) [A] 8-13* column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 35; figure 1 *; | [E]WO2004064115 (XICOR INC [US], et al) [E] 1-7 * page 29, line 28 - page 30, line 15; figure 4A * | International search | [A]US5859526 (DO TIEN-DUNG [FR], et al); | [A]US6292399 (LE BINH Q [US], et al); | [A]US6434051 (ENDO TORU [JP]) |