EP1590024 - A NEEDLE FOR PENETRATING A MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carmel Pharma AB P.O. Box 5352 402 28 Göteborg / SE | [2005/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINAST, Peter Gartenstrasse 12 71292 Friolzheim / DE | 02 /
ANDREASSON, Kjell Rödtungegatan 10B 426 58 Västra Frölunda / SE | 03 /
JÖRGENSEN, Einar Prilyckegatan 241 425 32 Hisings Kärra / SE | 04 /
BÄCKSTRÖM, Fredrik Vallhamnsgatan 108 421 66 Västra Frölunda / SE | [2016/17] |
Former [2005/44] | 01 /
KINAST, Peter Gartenstrasse 12 D-71292 Friolzheim / DE | ||
02 /
ANDREASSON, Kjell Rödtungegatan 10B S-426 58 Västra Frölunda / SE | |||
03 /
JÖRGENSEN, Einar Prilyckegatan 241 S-425 32 Hisings Kärra / SE | |||
04 /
BÄCKSTRÖM, Fredrik Vallhamnsgatan 108 S-421 66 Västra Frölunda / SE | Representative(s) | Valea AB P.O. Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/17] | Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Gothenburg / SE | ||
Former [2009/51] | Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Gothenburg / SE | ||
Former [2005/44] | Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 04703959.9 | 21.01.2004 | [2005/44] | WO2004SE00070 | Priority number, date | SE20030000155 | 21.01.2003 Original published format: SE 0300155 | US20030441098P | 21.01.2003 Original published format: US 441098 P | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004064903 | Date: | 05.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1590024 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1590024 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
A61M5/3286 (EP,US);
A61M2205/195 (EP,US);
Y10T29/1194 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/17] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NADEL ZUM DURCHSTECHEN EINER MEMBRAN | [2005/44] | English: | A NEEDLE FOR PENETRATING A MEMBRANE | [2005/44] | French: | AIGUILLE DE PENETRATION D'UNE MEMBRANE | [2005/44] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 20.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.10.2008 | 20.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.01.2004 | AT | 27.04.2016 | BE | 27.04.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | CY | 27.04.2016 | CZ | 27.04.2016 | DK | 27.04.2016 | EE | 27.04.2016 | FI | 27.04.2016 | MC | 27.04.2016 | NL | 27.04.2016 | RO | 27.04.2016 | SI | 27.04.2016 | SK | 27.04.2016 | TR | 27.04.2016 | GR | 28.07.2016 | PT | 29.08.2016 | LU | 21.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.01.2004 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
LU | 21.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 21.01.2004 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
LU | 21.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.01.2004 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
LU | 21.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/02] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
LU | 21.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 27.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2697438 (HICKEY GEORGE M); | [A]US3308822 (DE LUCA VINCENT D); | [A]DE2005519 ; | [A]US4490139 (HUIZENGA JOHN R [US], et al); | [X]US5456675 (WOLBRING PETER [DE], et al); | [X]EP0819442 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]); | [A]FR2757405 (VERMED [FR]); | [A]US5820609 (SAITO YOSHIKUNI [JP]); | [A]EP0995453 (JAPAN CO LTD DR [JP]) |