EP1601609 - DISPENSER WITH AN INTEGRALLY MOLDED NECK FINISH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graham Packaging Company, L.P. 2401 Pleasant Valley Road York, PA 17402 / US | [2005/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KROHN, Roy 142 Walnut Valley Court Wrightsville, PA 17368 / US | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04703976.3 | 21.01.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004US01305 | Priority number, date | US20030368524 | 19.02.2003 Original published format: US 368524 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004074115 | Date: | 02.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1601609 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/24, B65D35/08 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
B65D47/243 (EP,US);
B65D35/08 (EP,US);
B65D47/242 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/49] | B67D3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSGABE MIT EINEM EINSTÜCKIG GEFORMTEN HALSABSCHLUSS | [2005/49] | English: | DISPENSER WITH AN INTEGRALLY MOLDED NECK FINISH | [2005/49] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR A BAGUE DE GOULOT MOULEE D'UNE SEULE PIECE | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/05] | 06.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3197532 (MAASS EDWARD W) [A] 12,13,16,17* column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 23; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US3599845 (MILLER CHRISTIAN F) [X] 1,3,4,7-12,16 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 56 *; | [X]US4964548 (KENYON JR WILLIAM B [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,11,12,16 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 57; figures 1-13 *; | [XY]US5305932 (ISELI ANDREAS [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,11-13,16,17 * column 2, line 46 - column 5, line 45; figures 1-8 * [Y] 6; | [Y]WO0238360 (GRAHAM PACKAGING CO [US], et al) [Y] 6 * page 8, line 16 - page 12, line 16; figures 11-16 * | International search | [X]US5505346 (SMITH ROGER P [US]); | [X]US3120909 (MILLER IRA M); | [Y]US5996824 (GRANT CHRIS J [GB], et al); | [A]US5944234 (LAMPE WILLIAM H [US], et al); | [A]US5941642 (DARMSTADTER JON D [US]) |